Global Patent Index - EP 1371761 A3

EP 1371761 A3 2004-12-29 - Roller arrangement for a twisting head rotor

Title (en)

Roller arrangement for a twisting head rotor

Title (de)

Rollenanordnung für einen Zwirnkopfrotor

Title (fr)

Agencement de rouleaux pour un rotor d'une tête de retordage

Publication

EP 1371761 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 03006425 A

Priority

DE 20209091 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1371761A2] A cord twist rotor (2) evens out tension variations between two incoming threads. Threads are guided by pairs of rollers (3a, 3b; 4a, 4b) fixed with respect to each other. Each pair is enclosed in a discrete capsule (5) with a housing (6). The capsule housing has a bolt (7) which detaches the capsule (5) from the twist rotor (2). The pairs of rollers have parallel axes of rotation. The housing is a cylindrical sleeve whose axis is parallel to the axes of rotation (3c; 4c). Each sleeve (6) has two O-rings.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D02G 3/28; D01H 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 7/86 (2006.01); D02G 3/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 7/86 (2013.01); D02G 3/285 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20209091 U1 20031016; CN 100335697 C 20070905; CN 1467318 A 20040114; EP 1371761 A2 20031217; EP 1371761 A3 20041229; KR 20030095977 A 20031224

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081001

2005-09-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-09-21 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20050629

- Countries: AL

2005-09-21 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20050629

- Countries: LT

2005-09-21 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20050629

- Countries: LV

2005-09-21 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20050629

- Countries: MK

2005-03-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050113

2004-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK

2003-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2003-12-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK