Global Patent Index - EP 1373894 A4

EP 1373894 A4 20040421 - MICROCAVITY BIOSENSOR, METHODS OF MAKING, AND USES THEREOF

Title (en)

MICROCAVITY BIOSENSOR, METHODS OF MAKING, AND USES THEREOF

Title (de)

MIKROKAVITÄTSBIOSENSOR, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON

Title (fr)

BIOCAPTEUR A MICROCAVITE, PROCEDES DE FABRICATION ET UTILISATIONS DE CE DERNIER

Publication

EP 1373894 A4 20040421 (EN)

Application

EP 02706399 A 20020221

Priority

  • US 0205533 W 20020221
  • US 27052701 P 20010221

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2002192680A1] A biological sensor which includes: a porous semiconductor structure comprising a central layer interposed between upper and lower layers, each of the upper and lower layers including strata of alternating porosity; and one or more probes coupled to the porous semiconductor structure, the one or more probes binding to a target molecule, whereby a detectable change occurs in a refractive index of the biological sensor upon binding of the one or more probes to the target molecule. Methods of making the biological sensor and methods of using the same are disclosed, as is a detection device which includes such a biological sensor.

IPC 1-7

G01N 33/543; G01N 33/569; G01N 21/77; G02B 6/12; H01L 51/30

IPC 8 full level

C12M 1/34 (2006.01); C12M 3/00 (2006.01); G01N 21/77 (2006.01); G01N 33/53 (2006.01); G01N 33/543 (2006.01); G01N 33/552 (2006.01); G01N 33/554 (2006.01); G01N 33/569 (2006.01); G02B 6/12 (2006.01); H01L 51/30 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); C12Q 1/6825 (2018.01)

CPC (source: EP)

G01N 33/54373 (2013.01); G01N 33/552 (2013.01); C12Q 1/6825 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] WO 9912035 A1 19990311 - SCRIPPS RESEARCH INST [US], et al
  • [Y] WO 0003230 A1 20000120 - IATROQUEST CORP [CA]
  • [PX] CHAN S ET AL: "Identification of Gram negative bacteria using nanoscale silicon microcavities.", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. UNITED STATES 28 NOV 2001, vol. 123, no. 47, 28 November 2001 (2001-11-28), pages 11797 - 11798, XP002269450, ISSN: 0002-7863
  • [A] THEISS W ET AL: "OPTICAL SENSORS BASED ON POROUS SILICON MULTILAYERS;A PROTOTYPE", ADVANCES IN MICROCRYSTALLINE AND NANOCRYSTALLINE SEMICONDUCTORS. SYMPOSIUM, XX, XX, 2 December 1996 (1996-12-02), pages 637 - 642, XP000924937
  • See also references of WO 02068957A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

DOCDB simple family (publication)

US 2002192680 A1 20021219; US 7226733 B2 20070605; AT 348336 T 20070115; DE 60216735 D1 20070125; EP 1373894 A1 20040102; EP 1373894 A4 20040421; EP 1373894 B1 20061213; WO 02068957 A1 20020906

DOCDB simple family (application)

US 8263402 A 20020221; AT 02706399 T 20020221; DE 60216735 T 20020221; EP 02706399 A 20020221; US 0205533 W 20020221