EP 1374150 A4 20060118 - A SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ACOUSTIC FINGERPRINTING
Title (en)
A SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ACOUSTIC FINGERPRINTING
Title (de)
AKUSTISCHES FINGERPRINTING-SYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN
Title (fr)
SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR LA PRISE D'EMPREINTES ACOUSTIQUES
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 0207528 W 20020313
- US 27502901 P 20010313
- US 93185901 A 20010820
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO02073520A1] A method for quickly and accurately identifying a digital file (102), specifically one that represents an audio file. The identification can be used for tracking royalty payments to copyright owners. A database stores features of various audio files and a globally unique identifier (GUID) for each file. Advantageously, the method allows a database to be updated in the case of a new audio file by storing its features and generating a new unique identifier for the new file. The file is sampled to generate a fingerprint (106) that is used to determine if the file matched a file stored in the database (108). Advantageously, any label used for the work is automatically updated if it appears to be in error.
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
G06K 9/00 (2006.01); G10H 1/00 (2006.01); G10L 11/00 (2006.01); G10L 17/00 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
G10H 1/0041 (2013.01 - EP US); G10L 17/26 (2013.01 - EP US); G10L 25/48 (2013.01 - EP US); G06F 2218/08 (2023.01 - EP US); G10H 2250/261 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [A] US 5918223 A 19990629 - BLUM THOMAS L [US], et al
- [XY] WOLD E ET AL: "Content-based classification, search, and retrieval of audio", IEEE MULTIMEDIA, IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY, US, vol. 3, no. 3, 1996, pages 27 - 36, XP002154735, ISSN: 1070-986X
- [Y] RICHLY G ET AL: "Short-term sound stream characterization for reliable, real-time occurrence monitoring of given sound-prints", ELECTROTECHNICAL CONFERENCE, 2000. MELECON 2000. 10TH MEDITERRANEAN MAY 29-31, 2000, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, vol. 2, 29 May 2000 (2000-05-29), pages 526 - 528, XP010517844, ISBN: 0-7803-6290-X
- [X] WELSH M ET AL: "QUERYING LARGE COLLECTIONS OF MUSIC FOR SIMILARITY", UC BERKELEY TECHNICAL REPORT, no. -1096, November 1999 (1999-11-01), XP008027813
- [A] SUBRAMANYA S R ET AL: "Transform-based indexing of audio data for multimedia databases", MULTIMEDIA COMPUTING AND SYSTEMS '97. PROCEEDINGS., IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON OTTAWA, ONT., CANADA 3-6 JUNE 1997, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, 3 June 1997 (1997-06-03), pages 211 - 218, XP010239191, ISBN: 0-8186-7819-4
- [A] PAPAODYSSEUS C ET AL: "A NEW APPROACH TO THE AUTOMATIC RECOGNITION OF MUSICAL RECORDINGS", JOURNAL OF THE AUDIO ENGINEERING SOCIETY, AUDIO ENGINEERING SOCIETY, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 49, no. 1/2, January 2001 (2001-01-01), pages 23 - 35, XP001112482, ISSN: 1549-4950
- [PX] HAITSMA ET AL: "Robust Audio Hashing for Content Identification", PROCEEDINGS INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON CONTENT-BASED MULTIMEDIA INDEXING, 19 September 2001 (2001-09-19), pages 1 - 8, XP002198245
- See references of WO 02073520A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 02073520 A1 20020919; CA 2441012 A1 20020919; EP 1374150 A1 20040102; EP 1374150 A4 20060118; US 2002133499 A1 20020919
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 0207528 W 20020313; CA 2441012 A 20020313; EP 02721370 A 20020313; US 93185901 A 20010820