Global Patent Index - EP 1375292 B8

EP 1375292 B8 2013-09-18 - An apparatus for the transport of containers

Title (en)

An apparatus for the transport of containers

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Transport von Behältnissen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le transport de récipients

Publication

EP 1375292 B8 (DE)

Application

EP 03405436 A

Priority

CH 10622002 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1375292A1] The side frame (1) is a device for transporting cardboard boxes etc. It has a rectangular bottom plate which can run on rollers. There are wall elements (3) able to be fixed opposite each other on the bottom plate. These are made from a U-form tube and a grid held at a spacing from it. The grid in question is made from a flexible material.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B62B 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B62B 3/002 (2013.01); B62B 2501/065 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1375292 A1 20040102; EP 1375292 B1 20100310; EP 1375292 B8 20130918; DE 50312492 D1 20100422

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170630

2018-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170618

2018-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170630

2018-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20180103

2018-03-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180228

2018-02-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170618

2018-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2018-01-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50312492

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160704

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160623

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160623

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160526

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-06-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-02-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20101213

2010-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SPIERENBURG & PARTNER AG, PATENT- UND MARKENANWAEL

2010-04-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50312492 P 20100422

2010-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2010-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2010-03-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061208

2004-09-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2004-08-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040625

2004-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK