Global Patent Index - EP 1375787 A3

EP 1375787 A3 2004-12-29 - Striking plate assembly

Title (en)

Striking plate assembly

Title (de)

Schliessblech

Title (fr)

Gâche de serrure

Publication

EP 1375787 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 03254055 A

Priority

FI 20021257 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1375787A2] A striking plate assembly (1) for a lock to be secured to a frame comprising a striking plate (2), which has a bolt opening (3) arranged in the front surface (2.1) thereof and to which a bolt casing (4) is secured, inside of which casing a body part (5) providing a bolt housing is movably adapted, the bolt housing (5.1) itself forming a stationary part thereof, and an adjusting screw arrangement operated from the front surface (2.1) of the striking plate for adjusting the bolt housing (5.1) with respect to the striking plate (2), whereby the adjusting screw arrangement is arranged to be supported on one hand by the striking plate (2) and on the other hand by the bolt casing (4). The adjusting screw arrangement comprises guiding members (7, 8), which are arranged to affect directly the body part (5) so that they adjust the position of the bolt housing (5.1) with respect to the striking plate (2) and its bolt opening (3) and lock the current position of the body part (5) of the lock housing. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 15/025 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0735217 A2 19961002 - NIEMANN HANS DIETER [DE]
  • [A] EP 1010844 A1 20000621 - FUSS FRITZ GMBH & CO [DE]
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 14 22 December 1999 (1999-12-22)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 11 30 September 1999 (1999-09-30)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1375787 A2 20040102; EP 1375787 A3 20041229; EP 1375787 B1 20171220; DK 1375787 T3 20180409; FI 116983 B 20060428; FI 20021257 A0 20020627; FI 20021257 A 20031228; LT 1375787 T 20180326

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-15 [REG EE FG4A] TRANSLATION OF THE SPECIFICATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT VALID IN ESTONIA

- Document: EE E015266

- Effective date: 20180319

2018-05-15 [REG AT MK05] REVOCATION OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE EP PATENT

- Document: AT 956545 T

- Effective date: 20171220

2018-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171220

2018-04-25 [REG NL MP] PATENT VOIDED (INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED)

- Effective date: 20171220

2018-04-10 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2018-04-09 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Effective date: 20180404

2018-01-25 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 60350853

2018-01-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 956545 T

- Effective date: 20180115

2018-01-10 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2017-12-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2017-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2017-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK

2017-12-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2017-11-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABLOY OY

2017-08-16 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170719

2007-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070423

2005-09-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-09-21 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20050512

- Countries: AL

2005-09-21 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20050512

- Countries: LT

2005-09-21 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20050512

- Countries: LV

2005-09-21 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20050512

- Countries: MK

2005-07-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050512

2004-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK

2004-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK