Global Patent Index - EP 1376624 B1

EP 1376624 B1 2007-10-17 - Electrical component with an isolation zone

Title (en)

Electrical component with an isolation zone

Title (de)

Elektrisches Bauelement mit Isolationszone

Title (fr)

Composant électrique avec une zone isolante

Publication

EP 1376624 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 03013864 A

Priority

DE 10227563 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1376624A1] The base element is of ceramic (1) and on opposite surfaces of this are contact layers (2a,2). Electrical power is supplied using electrodes (4,4a) that have contacts (7) spaced along the length. These act as spacers to provide a defined gap (3) between the electrodes and the surface.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01C 7/102 (2006.01); H01C 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01C 7/102 (2013.01); H01C 7/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1376624 A1 20040102; EP 1376624 B1 20071017; DE 10227563 A1 20040115; DE 10227563 B4 20040812; DE 50308391 D1 20071129

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170623

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090618

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090618

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080627

- Year of fee payment: 6

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080617

- Year of fee payment: 6

2008-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080718

2008-04-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-02-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20080116

2007-11-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50308391 P 20071129

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-10-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-09-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-09-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040702

2004-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK