Global Patent Index - EP 1377701 B8

EP 1377701 B8 2007-10-31 - CLAMPING DEVICE FOR SEAM WEAVING MACHINES

Title (en)

CLAMPING DEVICE FOR SEAM WEAVING MACHINES

Title (de)

SPANNZANGE FÜR NAHTWEBMASCHINEN

Title (fr)

PINCE DE SERRAGE POUR MACHINES A TISSER A JOINT

Publication

EP 1377701 B8 (DE)

Application

EP 02730046 A

Priority

  • DE 20105091 U
  • EP 0203234 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO02077341A1] The clamping device (10) for grasping a thread during the production of a woven seam is arranged at the end of a draw-through gripper and comprises a first and a second clamping element, whereby the first and the second clamping element (20, 24) for grasping the thread can be tightened against one another by means of a pneumatic cylinder. The first clamping element comprises two interspaced cylinder surfaces (20) and the second clamping element has a cylinder surface (24). The arrangement of the cylinder surfaces (20, 24) is such that the axes of the cylinder surfaces are parallel to one another and are essentially located at a right angle to the axis of the pneumatic cylinder, and such that, when the pneumatic cylinder is in an extended position, the cylinder surface (24) of the second clamping element is located between both cylinder surfaces (20) of the first clamping element.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/16 (2006.01); D03D 41/00 (2006.01); D03J 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 41/00 (2013.01); D03J 1/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 20105091 U1 20020905; AT 367465 T 20070815; DE 50210506 D1 20070830; EP 1377701 A1 20040107; EP 1377701 B1 20070718; EP 1377701 B8 20071031; US 2004154678 A1 20040812; US 6948531 B2 20050927; WO 02077341 A1 20021003

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170329

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170303

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160322

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160322

2016-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160322

2016-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160322

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150327

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150325

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-04-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20150327

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-06-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080421

2007-10-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20071008

2007-08-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50210506 P 20070830

2007-08-15 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: HUYCK.WANGNER GERMANY GMBH

2007-07-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI GB IT

2007-07-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-05-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WANGNER GMBH

2006-12-20 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI GB IT

2004-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031014

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR