Global Patent Index - EP 1380249 B1

EP 1380249 B1 2009-02-18 - Dishwasher

Title (en)

Dishwasher

Title (de)

Geschirrspülmaschine

Title (fr)

Lave-vaisselle

Publication

EP 1380249 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 02258754 A

Priority

KR 20020039695 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1380249A2] A dishwasher is disclosed and comprises a housing (10), a chamber (20) to receive items to be washed and a removable filter (70) for filtering wash water. The dishwasher is configured so that the filter (70) is removable from the housing (10) without gaining access to the chamber (20).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/00 (2006.01); A47L 15/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/4206 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1380249 A2 20040114; EP 1380249 A3 20060412; EP 1380249 B1 20090218; CN 1203803 C 20050601; CN 1466931 A 20040114; DE 60231200 D1 20090402; JP 2004041679 A 20040212; KR 100441019 B1 20040721; KR 20040006153 A 20040124; US 2004007253 A1 20040115; US 6938627 B2 20050906

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141219

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60231200

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131212

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131213

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091119

2009-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090518

2009-04-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60231200 P 20090402

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE IT SE

2006-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE IT SE

2006-10-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060918

2006-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060727

2006-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2006-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2004-10-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.

2004-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-01-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO