Global Patent Index - EP 1380507 B1

EP 1380507 B1 2007-10-10 - BINDING MACHINE

Title (en)

BINDING MACHINE

Title (de)

BINDEMASCHINE

Title (fr)

MACHINE A LIER

Publication

EP 1380507 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 02705076 A

Priority

  • JP 0201990 W
  • JP 2001082291 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1380507A1] Conventionally, there resides such problem that when an operator carries out tying operation by inserting an item into an opening, since a bifurcated arm moves traversing the opening, the operator is given with sensation of fear. <??>Each of the tie guide members 61 and 62 moves toward the rear side parallel to each other in the side areas of the opening 11, and turns the tie-like member H around the periphery of the item M to guide both end sides of the tie-like member H toward the rear side. Each of the tie guide members 61 and 62 turns around the pivot pins 61a and 62a respectively as the fulcrum and moves toward the rear side and the tie guide portions 61b and 62b are made closer to each other at the rear side of the item M, thereby both end sides of the tie-like member H are made closer to each other. Owing to this, it is made possible to provide a binding machine with which the operator can carries out tying operation with security. <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 13/16 (2006.01); B65B 13/28 (2006.01); B65B 27/10 (2006.01); B65B 51/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 51/08 (2013.01); B65B 13/16 (2013.01); B65B 13/28 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1380507 A1 20040114; EP 1380507 A4 20040825; EP 1380507 B1 20071010; AT 375299 T 20071015; CN 1245309 C 20060315; CN 1511100 A 20040707; DE 60222877 D1 20071122; DE 60222877 T2 20080724; DK 1380507 T3 20080204; ES 2294105 T3 20080401; JP 2002284111 A 20021003; KR 100817196 B1 20080327; KR 20040015072 A 20040218; TW 521056 B 20030221; US 2004144068 A1 20040729; US 7013614 B2 20060321; WO 02076831 A1 20021003

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180123

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180116

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20180123

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-03-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180123

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-01-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170309

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170308

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-08-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071010

2010-07-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080304

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071010

2009-02-27 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071010

2009-01-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080111

2009-01-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080304

2008-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080711

2008-08-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071010

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071010

2008-05-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080310

2008-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071010

2008-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071010

2008-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080110

2008-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2294105 T3

2008-02-04 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2007-11-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60222877 P 20071122

2007-11-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2007-10-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2007-10-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-05-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KYOWA LIMITED

2007-05-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TANGE, SHINO

2007-05-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TANGE, SOICHI

2007-05-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TANGE, YAYOI

2006-11-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060929

2004-08-25 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040712

2004-01-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031020

2004-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR