Global Patent Index - EP 1381025 A3

EP 1381025 A3 2004-12-08 - Sound damping device having a Helmholtz resonator for installations with pulsating gas flows

Title (en)

Sound damping device having a Helmholtz resonator for installations with pulsating gas flows

Title (de)

Geräuschdämpfungsvorrichtung mit einem Helmholtz-Resonator bei Anlagen mit pulsierenden Gasströmungen

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'atténuation de bruit utilisant un résonateur de type Helmholtz dans des installations à courants de gaz pulsé

Publication

EP 1381025 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 03013618 A

Priority

DE 10231238 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1381025A2] The Helmholz resonator is formed as a chamber (2) coupled to an exhaust gas flow pipe (6) by a side tube (5) in which there is a valve (8) that can be used to close it. A second side tube (4) permanently connects with the resonator chamber. The valve is coupled to a controller (10)and is open or closed dependent upon the engine speed and load.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10K 11/172

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10K 11/16 (2006.01); G10K 11/172 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10K 11/161 (2013.01); G10K 11/172 (2013.01); F23R 2900/00013 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1381025 A2 20040114; EP 1381025 A3 20041208; DE 10231238 A1 20040129; DE 10231238 B4 20040603

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: EBERSPAECHER EXHAUST TECHNOLOGY GMBH & CO. KG

2010-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100315

2005-08-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-05-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050326

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK

2004-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-01-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK