Global Patent Index - EP 1383619 B1

EP 1383619 B1 2009-02-18 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE PRODUCTION OF ACCESSORY FORM ELEMENTS

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE PRODUCTION OF ACCESSORY FORM ELEMENTS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON NEBENFORMELEMENTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR PRODUIRE DES ELEMENTS DE FORME ACCESSOIRES

Publication

EP 1383619 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 02727360 A

Priority

  • DE 10121787 A
  • EP 0202418 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10121787C1] The invention relates to a method and a device for the production of varying elements in a hollow profile, enclosed around the circumference thereof. The device comprises an internal high pressure moulding tool, into the die recess of which a hollow profile blank may be inserted. A branch leads radially off from the die recess, in which the hollow profile blank may be expanded by means of a fluid internal high pressure to form the varying element. According to the invention, varying elements of almost any shape may be formed in the hollow element in a simple and process-secure manner with regard to the moulding process, whereby the device further comprises a membrane and a pressure generator, by means of which the membrane may be pressurised by a pressure medium in such a way that the membrane lies supported against the expanding direction during the expansion of the varying element as said element is formed. The membrane yields elastically on progressive formation of the varying element until the end form is achieved. The membrane is mounted on the tool outside the longitudinal edge of the die recess and stretching across the branching.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 26/037 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 26/037 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 10121787 C1 20020711; CA 2445406 A1 20021114; DE 50213291 D1 20090402; EP 1383619 A1 20040128; EP 1383619 B1 20090218; US 2004172999 A1 20040909; WO 02090014 A1 20021114

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171003

2017-10-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50213291

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160531

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120402

2012-12-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121130

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110404

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090218

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090518

2010-01-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091119

2010-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090518

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090529

2009-04-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50213291 P 20090402

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2009-02-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-11-05 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE PRODUCTION OF ACCESSORY FORM ELEMENTS

2007-12-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLER AG

2007-04-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

2006-12-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061123

2004-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031016

2004-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR