EP 1390382 A4 20071031 - ELUCIDATION OF GENE FUNCTION
Title (en)
ELUCIDATION OF GENE FUNCTION
Title (de)
AUFKLÄRUNG VON GENFUNKTION
Title (fr)
ELUCIDATION DE LA FONCTION DE GENES
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 0213432 W 20020430
- US 28733501 P 20010430
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO02088165A1] Articles and methods are provided for determining the function of genes in a rapid and cost effective manner. Nucleic acids are arrayed upon a substrate. In accordance with certain preferred embodiments, viable cells are subsequently caused to be bound to the substrate at the locations occupied by the nucleic acids. Subsequent transduction or transfection of the cells by the nucleic acids followed by continued vitality of the cells permits expression of the proteins encoded by the respected nucleic acids. Knowledge of the identity of the nucleic acids, at least as regards their locations on the substrate, permits determination of protein function thereof. Methods of creating and using such cell-arrays, and methods of reverse-transfection and reverse-transduction are featured.
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
C07H 21/04 (2006.01); C12N 15/10 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
C12N 15/1034 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [X] SIMONSEN H ET AL: "CLONING BY FUNCTION: EXPRESSION CLONING IN MAMMALIAN CELLS", TRENDS IN PHARMACOLOGICAL SCIENCES, ELSEVIER, HAYWARTH, GB, vol. 15, no. 12, December 1994 (1994-12-01), pages 437 - 441, XP001084196, ISSN: 0165-6147
- [A] SCHENA M ET AL: "QUANTITATIVE MONITORING OF GENE EXPRESSION PATTERNS WITH A COMPLEMENTARY DNAMICROARRAY", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE,, US, vol. 270, no. 5235, 20 October 1995 (1995-10-20), pages 467 - 470, XP000644675, ISSN: 0036-8075
- [A] MACBEATH G ET AL: "Printing proteins as microarrays for high-throughput function determination", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE,, US, vol. 289, no. 5485, 8 September 2000 (2000-09-08), pages 1760 - 1763, XP002279793, ISSN: 0036-8075
- [PX] ZIAUDDIN J ET AL: "Microarrays of cells expressing defined cDNAs", NATURE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, LONDON, GB, vol. 411, 3 May 2001 (2001-05-03), pages 107 - 110, XP002963625, ISSN: 0028-0836
- See references of WO 02088165A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 02088165 A1 20021107; CA 2445884 A1 20021107; EP 1390382 A1 20040225; EP 1390382 A4 20071031
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 0213432 W 20020430; CA 2445884 A 20020430; EP 02729046 A 20020430