Global Patent Index - EP 1393644 B1

EP 1393644 B1 2007-10-31 - Shoe insole for sport shoe

Title (en)

Shoe insole for sport shoe

Title (de)

Innensohle für Sportschuhe

Title (fr)

Semelle interne pour chaussure de sport

Publication

EP 1393644 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 03018676 A

Priority

FR 0210828 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1393644A1] The inner sole for sports footwear has a semi-rigid shell covered in a flexible material. The inner sole has a boss (3) supporting the inner face of the foot (14). The boss extends from the base of the calcaneum (15) to the articulation between the cuneiform (18) and M1 (19) along its length. The high point of the of the boss is at the level of the joints between the astragal and scaphoid (17) and between the astragal and the calcaneum.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/04 (2006.01); A43B 7/14 (2006.01); A43B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 7/142 (2013.01); A43B 5/0415 (2013.01); A43B 7/144 (2013.01); A43B 7/1495 (2013.01); A43B 17/003 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1393644 A1 20040303; EP 1393644 B1 20071031; DE 60317144 D1 20071213; DE 60317144 T2 20080814; FR 2843856 A1 20040305; FR 2843856 B1 20050304

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090909

- Year of fee payment: 7

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-06-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60317144

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-05-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110502

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090828

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080822

2008-10-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080801

2007-12-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60317144 P 20071213

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2004-11-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2004-10-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040813

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-03-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK