Global Patent Index - EP 1393957 B1

EP 1393957 B1 2007-10-17 - Electrical load controlling device

Title (en)

Electrical load controlling device

Title (de)

Steuerungsgerät einer elektrischen Last

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande d'une charge électrique

Publication

EP 1393957 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 03019271 A

Priority

  • JP 2002247065 A
  • JP 2002297393 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1393957A2] A hunting detecting device used for an electrical load detecting device sets a current command value for an electrical load. Based on a deviation between a current that actually flows through the electrical load and the current command value, the hunting detecting device performs at least proportional control in a group including proportional control, integral control, and differential control. The hunting detecting device sends a current generated based on the performed control to the electrical load. A current determining device determines whether there is a current through the electrical load. When the current determining device determines that there is a current through the electrical load, a hunting detector detects a number of times of hunting within a predetermined period. <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60K 23/08 (2006.01); B60L 3/00 (2006.01); B60L 15/20 (2006.01); F16D 27/00 (2006.01); F16D 48/06 (2006.01); H02P 23/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60L 3/04 (2013.01); B60K 23/0808 (2013.01); B60L 3/0023 (2013.01); B60L 3/0069 (2013.01); B60L 11/123 (2013.01); B60L 11/14 (2013.01); B60L 15/20 (2013.01); F16D 48/064 (2013.01); H02P 23/04 (2013.01); B60L 2250/10 (2013.01); B60L 2260/28 (2013.01); B60W 2510/0604 (2013.01); B60W 2520/28 (2013.01); F16D 2500/1022 (2013.01); F16D 2500/10412 (2013.01); F16D 2500/10431 (2013.01); F16D 2500/1045 (2013.01); F16D 2500/3021 (2013.01); F16D 2500/3022 (2013.01); F16D 2500/3115 (2013.01); F16D 2500/70223 (2013.01); F16D 2500/70418 (2013.01); F16D 2500/70615 (2013.01); F16D 2500/70626 (2013.01); Y02T 10/6217 (2013.01); Y02T 10/644 (2013.01); Y02T 10/645 (2013.01); Y02T 10/7077 (2013.01); Y02T 10/7275 (2013.01); Y10T 477/23 (2013.01); Y10T 477/6352 (2013.01); Y10T 477/6934 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1393957 A2 20040303; EP 1393957 A3 20040428; EP 1393957 B1 20071017; DE 60316886 D1 20071129; DE 60316886 T2 20080731; EP 1747932 A2 20070131; EP 1747932 A3 20070404; EP 1747932 A8 20071010; EP 1747932 B1 20110928; US 2004044459 A1 20040304; US 7006899 B2 20060228

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-14 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160712

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160823

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-07-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090826

2010-04-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090826

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080903

- Year of fee payment: 6

2008-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080718

2008-06-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-03-05 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WAKAO, HISAAKI C/O JTEKT CORPORATION

2008-03-05 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KATO, KIYOSHIGE C/O JTEK CORPORATION

2007-11-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60316886 P 20071129

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-10-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-10-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WAKAO, HISAAKI C/O JTEKT CORPORATION

2007-10-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KATO, KIYOSHIGE C/O JTEK CORPORATION

2006-11-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WAKAO, HISAAKI C/O JTEKT CORPORATION

2006-11-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KATO, KIYOSHIGE, C/O JTEK CORPORATION

2006-10-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: JTEKT CORPORATION

2006-08-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060705

2005-01-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-10-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040805

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK

2004-04-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 60K 23/08 A

2004-04-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 16D 48/06 B

2004-04-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 16D 27/00 B

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-03-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK