Global Patent Index - EP 1396368 A3

EP 1396368 A3 2004-12-15 - Vibration suppression apparatus and method for hybrid vehicle

Title (en)

Vibration suppression apparatus and method for hybrid vehicle

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Unterdrückung von Schwingungen und Verfahren für Hybridfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Dispositif de suppression de vibrations et méthode pour véhicule hybrid

Publication

EP 1396368 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 03019194 A

Priority

JP 2002245722 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1396368A2] In vibration suppression apparatus and method for a hybrid vehicle, the hybrid vehicle comprises at least one main power source (1), a plurality of auxiliary power sources (2), and a planetary gear mechanism (3) to modify a gear ratio when an output of the main power source is transmitted to a drive output member and two power sources whose torque controls are enabled to be performed are selected and a vibration suppression control signal is superposed onto each of torque commands supplied to the selected two power sources to suppress two-degrees-of-freedom vibrations of the planetary gear mechanism (3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60K 6/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60K 6/365 (2007.10); B60K 6/445 (2007.10); B60K 6/54 (2007.10); B60L 11/14 (2006.01); B60W 10/06 (2006.01); B60W 10/08 (2006.01); B60W 10/10 (2012.01); B60W 20/00 (2006.01); B60K 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60W 30/20 (2013.01); B60K 6/365 (2013.01); B60K 6/445 (2013.01); B60K 6/54 (2013.01); B60L 11/14 (2013.01); B60W 10/06 (2013.01); B60W 10/08 (2013.01); B60W 10/10 (2013.01); B60W 10/115 (2013.01); B60W 20/00 (2013.01); B60K 1/02 (2013.01); B60L 2240/461 (2013.01); B60L 2240/465 (2013.01); B60W 2050/0014 (2013.01); B60W 2510/083 (2013.01); B60W 2520/28 (2013.01); B60W 2540/10 (2013.01); F16H 2037/103 (2013.01); Y02T 10/6239 (2013.01); Y02T 10/6286 (2013.01); Y02T 10/70 (2013.01); Y02T 10/7077 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1396368 A2 20040310; EP 1396368 A3 20041215; EP 1396368 B1 20080730; DE 60322484 D1 20080911; US 2005247503 A1 20051110; US 7110867 B2 20060919

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160825

2017-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160831

2017-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170301

2017-05-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170428

2017-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160825

2017-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60322484

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150629

- Year of fee payment: 13

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150819

- Year of fee payment: 13

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150818

- Year of fee payment: 13

2015-06-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-07-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090506

2008-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60322484 P 20080911

2008-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-07-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-01-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B60K 6/365 20071001AFI20071217BHEP

2007-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050812

2005-09-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK

2004-07-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NISSAN MOTOR COMPANY, LIMITED

2004-07-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: RENAULT S.A.S. SOCIETE PAR ACTIONS SIMPLIFIEE

2004-07-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: IMAZU, TOMOYA

2004-07-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KARGAR, KEYVAN

2004-07-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PICHON, YVES

2004-03-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030825

2004-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-03-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK