Global Patent Index - EP 1396594 B1

EP 1396594 B1 2009-02-18 - Post connecting device

Title (en)

Post connecting device

Title (de)

Befestigungsvorrichtung für Pfosten

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fixation de poteaux

Publication

EP 1396594 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 03019429 A

Priority

DE 10241020 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1396594A2] The device (101) for the fastening of posts to a hard foundation has an anchor element (103) with fastening means (105) for fixing to the foundation, and a post support (102) detachably connected to the anchor element to hold the end of the post. The anchor element on its side facing the post support is constructed flat and has openings (104) in which engage fastening elements (113) extending from the post support. The anchor element is curved in construction so that in its assembled state a cavity exists between its underside and the foundation.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 12/22 (2006.01); E01F 9/011 (2006.01); E01F 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 12/2261 (2013.01); E01F 9/681 (2016.02); E01F 13/026 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1396594 A2 20040310; EP 1396594 A3 20041201; EP 1396594 B1 20090218; AT 423251 T 20090315; DE 10241020 A1 20040325; DE 50311187 D1 20090402

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-06-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50311187

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100828

2011-05-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110502

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091026

- Year of fee payment: 7

2010-01-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091119

2009-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090820

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090819

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-04-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50311187 P 20090402

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR

2007-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070524

2005-08-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR

2005-07-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050509

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK

2004-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-03-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK