Global Patent Index - EP 1396688 A3

EP 1396688 A3 2004-12-15 - Heat exchanger for fuel fired water heater

Title (en)

Heat exchanger for fuel fired water heater

Title (de)

Wärmeübertrager für brennstoffbeheizte Wassererhitzer

Title (fr)

Echangeur de chaleur pour chauffe-eau chauffé par un combustible

Publication

EP 1396688 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 03018275 A

Priority

DE 10241060 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1396688A2] The heat exchanger (8) for fuel-heated water heaters has water pipes (12,14) in at least two rows (18,20), with one above the other, and at least one packet of plates (22,24) penetrated by the pipes and between which are formed gaps (26,28) for the passage of combustion gases, and with the narrow sides of the plates tapering vertically upwards. The narrow sides of the plates in relation to the inner wall (1) of the heater (10) are located approximately gap-free, while the wide sides of the plates define the inlet and outlet length of the gaps for the passage of the combustion gases.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 9/00; F28F 1/32; F28F 9/013

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/00 (2006.01); F28F 1/32 (2006.01); F24H 1/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 1/32 (2013.01); F24H 9/0026 (2013.01); F24H 1/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] EP 0881437 A2 19981202 - BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]
  • [Y] DE 9017483 U1 19910321
  • [XY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 04 31 August 2000 (2000-08-31)
  • [XY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 0132, no. 23 (M - 829) 24 May 1989 (1989-05-24)
  • [XY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 11 28 November 1997 (1997-11-28)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 03 31 March 1999 (1999-03-31)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1396688 A2 20040310; EP 1396688 A3 20041215; DE 10241060 A1 20040318

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050616

2005-10-13 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-09-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK

2004-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-03-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK