Global Patent Index - EP 1397533 B1

EP 1397533 B1 2007-10-24 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR LOCALLY REMOVING COATINGS FROM PARTS

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR LOCALLY REMOVING COATINGS FROM PARTS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM LOKALEN ENTSCHICHTEN VON BAUTEILEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'ENLEVEMENT DE COUCHE LOCAL SUR DES PIECES

Publication

EP 1397533 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 02740263 A

Priority

  • DE 0201447 W
  • DE 10128507 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO02103088A1] The invention relates to a method and device for locally removing coatings from parts, whereby the invention involves the provision of a part (5) having a coating at least in areas and the provision of an absorbent medium, which is supplied with a coating removal liquid. The medium containing coating removal liquid is brought into contact with the area of the part (5) from which the coating is to be removed.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25F 5/00 (2006.01); C23C 4/02 (2006.01); C23C 10/02 (2006.01); C23F 1/02 (2006.01); C23F 1/44 (2006.01); C25F 7/00 (2006.01); F01D 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23F 1/02 (2013.01); C23C 4/02 (2013.01); C23C 10/02 (2013.01); C23F 1/44 (2013.01); C25F 5/00 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 02103088 A1 20021227; CA 2450259 A1 20021227; CA 2450259 C 20100209; DE 10128507 A1 20030116; DE 10128507 B4 20080717; DE 50211111 D1 20071206; EP 1397533 A1 20040317; EP 1397533 B1 20071024; US 2004244910 A1 20041209; US 7513986 B2 20090407

INPADOC legal status


2015-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140419

2015-01-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-01-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50211111

- Effective date: 20141101

2014-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140419

2014-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50211111

2013-12-11 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20131114 AND 20131120

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130523

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130423

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130422

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080725

2008-07-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-01-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20080109

2007-12-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50211111 P 20071206

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-10-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-10-24 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-07-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ALBRECHT, ANTON

2007-07-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: EBERLEIN, ARMIN

2007-07-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GOLD, KARSTEN

2007-07-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHNEIDER, ALBERT

2007-07-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ALBRECHT, ANTON

2007-07-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: EBERLEIN, ARMIN

2007-07-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GOLD, KARSTEN

2007-07-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHNEIDER, ALBERT

2004-03-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031125

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR