Global Patent Index - EP 1401440 A4

EP 1401440 A4 20060705 - METHODS OF USE OF FLUOROQUINOLONE COMPOUNDS AGAINST BACTERIA

Title (en)

METHODS OF USE OF FLUOROQUINOLONE COMPOUNDS AGAINST BACTERIA

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG VON FLUORCHINOLONE VERBINDUNGEN GEGEN BAKTERIEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDES D'UTILISATION DES COMPOSES DES FLUOROQUINOLONES CONTRE LES BACTERIES

Publication

EP 1401440 A4 20060705 (EN)

Application

EP 00993844 A 20000831

Priority

  • US 0023883 W 20000831
  • US 15183699 P 19990901
  • US 15196099 P 19990901
  • US 15191799 P 19990901
  • US 15183599 P 19990901
  • US 15183799 P 19990901
  • US 15183499 P 19990901
  • US 15411599 P 19990914
  • US 15388499 P 19990914
  • US 15534999 P 19990922
  • US 15538399 P 19990922
  • US 15538099 P 19990922
  • US 15534899 P 19990922
  • US 15539399 P 19990922
  • US 15515099 P 19990922
  • US 15537999 P 19990922
  • US 15539599 P 19990922
  • US 15535899 P 19990922
  • US 15534699 P 19990922
  • US 15514999 P 19990922
  • US 15534499 P 19990922
  • US 15539199 P 19990922
  • US 15538199 P 19990922
  • US 15535999 P 19990922
  • US 15533899 P 19990922
  • US 15538499 P 19990922
  • US 15534099 P 19990922
  • US 15538299 P 19990922
  • US 15539499 P 19990922
  • US 15539299 P 19990922
  • US 15534799 P 19990922
  • US 15514899 P 19990922
  • US 15536099 P 19990922
  • US 15586999 P 19990924
  • US 15586899 P 19990924
  • US 15595799 P 19990924

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0115695A1] This invention relates, in part, to newly identifid methods of using quinolone antibiotics, particulrly a gemifloxacin compound against certain bactera, especially pathogenic bacteria.

IPC 8 full level

A61K 31/44 (2006.01); A61K 31/444 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); C07D 471/04 (2006.01)

CPC (source: EP)

A61K 31/44 (2013.01); A61P 31/04 (2017.12)

Citation (search report)

  • [DXY] OH J-I ET AL: "IN VITRO AND IN VIVO EVALUATIONS OF LB20304, A NEW FLUORONAPHTHYRIDONE", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, vol. 40, no. 6, June 1996 (1996-06-01), pages 1564 - 1568, XP000911979, ISSN: 0066-4804
  • [XY] BERRY V ET AL: "COMPARATIVE EFFICACY OF GEMIFLOXACIN AGAINST EXPERIMENTAL RTI IN RATS CAUSED BY S. PNEUMONIAE", JOURNAL OF ANTIMICROBIAL CHEMOTHERAPY, SAUNDERS CO. LTD., LONDON, GB, vol. 44, no. SUPPL A, 4 July 1999 (1999-07-04), pages 148,ANP492, XP008009869, ISSN: 0305-7453
  • [XDY] CORMICAN M G ET AL: "ANTIMICROBIAL ACTIVITY AND SPECTRUM OF LB20304, A NOVEL FLUORONAPHTHYRIDONE", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, vol. 41, no. 1, January 1997 (1997-01-01), pages 204 - 211, XP000911943, ISSN: 0066-4804
  • [XY] JOHNSON D M ET AL: "ANTI-STREPTOCOCCAL ACTIVITY OF SB-265805 (LB20304, A NOVEL FLUORONAPHTHYRIDONE, COMPARED WITH FIVE OTHER COMPOUNDS, INCLUDING QUALITY CONTROL GUIDELINES", DIAGNOSTIC MICROBIOLOGY AND INFECTIOUS DISEASES, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHING CO., AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 33, no. 2, February 1999 (1999-02-01), pages 87 - 91, XP000911956, ISSN: 0732-8893
  • [Y] MA Z: "GEMIFLOXACIN LG CHEMICAL LTD", CURRENT OPINION IN ANTI-INFECTIVE INVESTIGATIONAL DRUGS, PHARMA PRESS,, GB, vol. 1, no. 4, 1999, pages 493 - 500, XP008009846, ISSN: 1464-8458
  • [PXY] MACKENZIE H ET AL: "Postantibiotic effect (PAE) of gemifloxacin (SB-265805) in S. pneumoniae with diminished susceptibility to ciprofloxacin", ABSTRACTS OF THE INTERSCIENCE CONFERENCE ON ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, vol. 39, 1999, & 39TH INTERSCIENCE CONFERENCE ON ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY; SAN FRANCISCO, CALIFORNIA, USA; SEPTEMBER 26-29, 1999, pages 268, XP001246835
  • See references of WO 0115695A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

DOCDB simple family (publication)

WO 0115695 A1 20010308; AU 6947900 A 20010326; EP 1401440 A1 20040331; EP 1401440 A4 20060705; JP 2004507440 A 20040311

DOCDB simple family (application)

US 0023883 W 20000831; AU 6947900 A 20000831; EP 00993844 A 20000831; JP 2001519909 A 20000831