Global Patent Index - EP 1402934 B8

EP 1402934 B8 2007-10-10 - Electret articles and filters with increased oily mist resistance

Title (en)

Electret articles and filters with increased oily mist resistance

Title (de)

Elektretartikel und Filter mit erhöhter Beständigkeit gegen ölhaltigen Nebel

Title (fr)

Articles et filtres en électret avec résistance augmentée à un brouillard huileux

Publication

EP 1402934 B8 (EN)

Application

EP 03026835 A

Priority

  • EP 98904680 A
  • US 94127097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9916532A1] Novel electret articles containing a polymer and a performance-enhancing additive can be identified by their thermally stimulated conductivity characteristics or their filtration properties. Electret articles such as nonwoven filter webs and respirators exhibits superior oily mist loading performance, low penetration and a small pressure drop. The electret articles are preferably produced by melt-blowing a blend of a polymer and a fluorochemical additive selected from the group consisting of formulae (I), (II) and (III).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01D 39/08 (2006.01); B01D 39/16 (2006.01); A62B 23/00 (2006.01); A62B 23/02 (2006.01); B01D 39/14 (2006.01); B03C 3/28 (2006.01); D01F 1/10 (2006.01); D01F 6/06 (2006.01); D01F 6/46 (2006.01); D01F 8/06 (2006.01); D04H 1/42 (2012.01); D04H 1/56 (2006.01); D06M 10/02 (2006.01); D06M 13/02 (2006.01); D06M 13/322 (2006.01); D06M 13/418 (2006.01); D06M 15/227 (2006.01); H01G 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01D 39/163 (2013.01); A62B 23/00 (2013.01); A62B 23/02 (2013.01); B01D 39/1607 (2013.01); B03C 3/28 (2013.01); D01F 1/10 (2013.01); D01F 6/06 (2013.01); D01F 8/06 (2013.01); D04H 1/4291 (2013.01); D04H 1/435 (2013.01); D04H 1/4382 (2013.01); D04H 1/56 (2013.01); H01G 7/023 (2013.01); Y02A 50/2352 (2018.01); Y10S 55/05 (2013.01); Y10S 55/33 (2013.01); Y10S 55/35 (2013.01); Y10S 55/39 (2013.01); Y10S 264/48 (2013.01); Y10T 442/2189 (2015.04); Y10T 442/227 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9916532 A1 19990408; AU 6249498 A 19990423; AU 740968 B2 20011115; BR 9812585 A 20000725; CA 2303004 A1 19990408; CN 1101241 C 20030212; CN 1272069 A 20001101; DE 69837864 D1 20070712; DE 69837864 T2 20081224; DE 69839703 D1 20080821; EP 1019173 A1 20000719; EP 1019173 B1 20080709; EP 1019173 B9 20081105; EP 1402934 A1 20040331; EP 1402934 B1 20070530; EP 1402934 B8 20071010; JP 2003520659 A 20030708; JP 2009006313 A 20090115; KR 100496233 B1 20050620; KR 20010024378 A 20010326; PL 195918 B1 20071130; PL 339650 A1 20010102; RU 2199372 C2 20030227; US 6214094 B1 20010410; US 6238466 B1 20010529; US 6261342 B1 20010717

INPADOC legal status


2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-23 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69837864

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69837864

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130123

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080126

2008-10-31 [PGRI DE] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Effective date: 20080715

2008-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080126

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080125

2008-05-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080303

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070831

2007-07-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69837864 P 20070712

2007-05-30 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1019173 P

2007-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-05-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-06-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050413

2004-12-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-03-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031219

2004-03-31 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1019173 P

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL