Global Patent Index - EP 1404763 B8

EP 1404763 B8 2007-10-10 - METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF PLANE-PARALLEL PLATELETS BY USING ORGANIC SEPARATING AGENTS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF PLANE-PARALLEL PLATELETS BY USING ORGANIC SEPARATING AGENTS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PLANPARALLELEN PLÄTTCHEN MITTELS ORGANISCHER TRENNMITTEL

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE PLAQUETTES A FACES PARALLELES AU MOYEN D'UN AGENT DE SEPARATION ORGANIQUE

Publication

EP 1404763 B8 (DE)

Application

EP 02742774 A

Priority

  • DE 0201858 W
  • DE 10124796 A
  • DE 10150562 A
  • DE 10151375 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO02094945A1] A novel method for the production of plane-parallel platelets with the following steps is disclosed: a) vapour deposition of a separating agent on a substrate to give a separating agent layer at a sub-atmospheric pressure, b) vapour deposition of a least one product layer on the separating agent layer at a sub-atmospheric pressure and c) dissolving the separating agent layer in a solvent and generation of a suspension with at least one product layer in the form of plane-parallel platelets. Said method is characterised in that the separating agent is selected from the group comprising anthracene, anthraquinone, acetamidophenol, acetylsalicylic acid, camphoric anhydride, benzimidazole, benzene-1,2,4-tricarboxylic acid, biphenyl-2,2-dicarboxylic acid, bis(4-hydroxyphenyl)-sulphone, dihydroxyanthraquinone, hydantoin, 3-hydroxybenzoic acid, 8-hydroxyquinoline-5-sulphonic acid monohydrate, 4-hydroxycoumarin, 7-hydroxycoumarin, 3-hydroxynaphthalene-2-carboxylic acid, isophthalic acid, 4,4-methylene-bis-3-hydroxynaphthalene-2-carboxylic acid, naphthalene-1,8-dicarboxylic acid anhydride, phthalimide and the potassium salt thereof, phenolphthalein, phenothiazine, saccharin and salts thereof, tetraphenylmethane, triphenylene, triphenylmethanol, and mixtures of at least two of said substances. Aromatic compounds with at least one benzene ring are particularly suitable as separating agents. The invention further relates to the use of plane-parallel platelets thus produced and products obtained as above.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C09C 1/00; C23C 14/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C09C 1/00 (2006.01); C09C 1/62 (2006.01); C09C 1/64 (2006.01); C09C 3/06 (2006.01); C09C 3/08 (2006.01); C09C 3/12 (2006.01); C09D 5/24 (2006.01); C09D 11/00 (2006.01); C09D 201/00 (2006.01); C23C 14/00 (2006.01); C23C 14/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B82Y 30/00 (2013.01); C09C 1/62 (2013.01); C09C 1/627 (2013.01); C09C 1/64 (2013.01); C23C 14/0005 (2013.01); C23C 14/024 (2013.01); C01P 2004/20 (2013.01); C01P 2004/62 (2013.01); C01P 2004/64 (2013.01); C01P 2006/12 (2013.01); Y10T 428/31663 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 02094945 A1 20021128; AT 305954 T 20051015; BR 0209964 A 20040413; CA 2446428 A1 20021128; CA 2446428 C 20101026; CN 1302074 C 20070228; CN 1610729 A 20050427; DE 50204481 D1 20060216; DK 1404763 T3 20051212; EP 1404763 A1 20040407; EP 1404763 B1 20051005; EP 1404763 B8 20071010; ES 2249594 T3 20060401; JP 2004532334 A 20041021; JP 4511795 B2 20100728; MX PA03010581 A 20041206; US 2004131776 A1 20040708; US 7157116 B2 20070102

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151201

2015-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50204481

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140731

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090521

2010-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100129

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090521

2010-01-11 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2009-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070521

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080428

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051005

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080416

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060521

2008-07-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051005

2008-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080416

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20080421

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-05-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: CIBA HOLDING INC.

- Free text: CIBA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS HOLDING INC.#KLYBECKSTRASSE 141#4057 BASEL (CH) -TRANSFER TO- CIBA HOLDING INC.#KLYBECKSTRASSE 141#4057 BASEL (CH)

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CIBA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS HOLDING INC.

- Effective date: 20060531

2007-08-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060706

2007-08-29 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: WEINERT, HILMAR

2007-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060522

2007-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061201

2007-01-16 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2006-09-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060706

2006-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 5

2006-05-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060522

2006-05-22 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060522

2006-05-21 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060521

2006-05-03 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2006-05-03 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: DER ERFINDER HAT AUF SEINE NENNUNG VERZICHTET.

2006-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2249594 T3

2006-03-06 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060306

2006-02-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50204481 P 20060216

2006-01-31 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-01-05 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060105

2005-12-21 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: DER ERFINDER HAT AUF SEINE NENNUNG VERZICHTET.

2005-12-12 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-11-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-10-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20051005

2005-10-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-10-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-10-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-10-05 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051005

2005-10-05 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051005

2004-04-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031027

2004-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-04-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI