Global Patent Index - EP 1406752 B1

EP 1406752 B1 2009-02-25 - HOLDING ARRANGEMENT FOR PUNCHING TOOL INSERT

Title (en)

HOLDING ARRANGEMENT FOR PUNCHING TOOL INSERT

Title (de)

HALTEANORDNUNG FÜR STANZWERKZEUGEINSATZ

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE BLOCAGE POUR PLAQUETTE D'OUTIL DE POIN ONNAGE

Publication

EP 1406752 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 01999465 A

Priority

  • DE 10060339 A
  • US 0145102 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0245924A1] A holding arrangement for attaching a tool insert to a holder with the aid of a ball which is movably held in an obliquely disposed conduit; the width of a conduit opening at the recess opening being less than the ball diameter. In the locked position, the ball, under the influence of a compression spring, is located in an identation in an outer face of the tool insert. To enable initiating such locking even in thin holders, the upper opening of the conduit is covered by a holding element which forms an abutment for the compression spring. As a result, threr is a considerable gain in spring travel, which makes it possible to use this holding arrangement even in thin holders.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/26 (2006.01); B21D 28/34 (2006.01); B26F 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B30B 15/026 (2013.01); B21D 28/34 (2013.01); B26D 7/2614 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0245924 A1 20020613; WO 0245924 A9 20021219; AU 1999502 A 20020618; DE 10060339 A1 20020613; DE 10060339 B4 20161124; EP 1406752 A1 20040414; EP 1406752 A4 20061227; EP 1406752 B1 20090225

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-12-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-12-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-02-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091126

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

2009-02-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-07-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

2007-12-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071116

2006-12-27 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20061129

2004-04-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030503

2004-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH FR GB IT LI