Global Patent Index - EP 1407997 A4

EP 1407997 A4 2010-02-17 - ELEVATOR DEVICE

Title (en)

ELEVATOR DEVICE

Title (de)

HUBVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

ELEVATEUR

Publication

EP 1407997 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 01948003 A

Priority

JP 0106079 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1407997A1] An elevator device so designed that when a car (1) tries to lift/lower beyond predetermined limits in a shaft (10), the pulley (5) of a hoist (4) slips with respect to a traction rope (3). This ensures that even if the car tries to lift/lower beyond the predetermined limits in the shaft, such lifting/lowering beyond the predetermined limits is prevented, thus preventing such drawbacks as deformation and damage to the components of the device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 11/08; B66B 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 5/02 (2006.01); B66B 5/08 (2006.01); B66B 5/12 (2006.01); B66B 7/06 (2006.01); B66B 11/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 15/02 (2013.01); B66B 15/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1407997 A1 20040414; EP 1407997 A4 20100217; EP 1407997 B1 20111019; CN 1206153 C 20050615; CN 1469838 A 20040121; JP 4862244 B2 20120125; JP WO2003008321 A1 20041104; KR 100535901 B1 20051209; KR 20030034246 A 20030501; WO 03008321 A1 20030130

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60145548

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140709

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-07-03 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 60145548

- Effective date: 20140326

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-04-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130329

2012-11-15 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60145548

- Effective date: 20120720

2012-09-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20120720

2012-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20111019

2012-02-08 [REG NL VDEP] INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED

- Effective date: 20111019

2012-01-19 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 60145548

- Effective date: 20120119

2011-10-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR NL

2011-05-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR NL

2010-05-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100427

2010-02-17 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20100120

2006-05-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA

2004-04-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030411

2004-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR