Global Patent Index - EP 1409011 A4

EP 1409011 A4 20050921 - PRIME-BOOST VACCINATION STRATEGY

Title (en)

PRIME-BOOST VACCINATION STRATEGY

Title (de)

PRIME-BOOST IMPFSTRATEGIE(28.07.01)

Title (fr)

STRATEGIE DE VACCINATION PRIME-BOOST (PRIMO-IMMUNISATION-RAPPEL)

Publication

EP 1409011 A4 20050921 (EN)

Application

EP 01901061 A 20010122

Priority

  • AU 0100059 W 20010122
  • AU PQ520800 A 20000121

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0152886A1] The present invention provides a method for inducing an immune response to an antigen in a subject. The method comprises administering to the subject DNA encoding the antigen, and subsequently orally administering to the subject a composition comprising transgenic material, wherein the transgenic material comprises a DNA molecule encoding the antigen such that the antigen is expressed in the transgenic material.

IPC 1-7

A61K 39/165; A01H 5/00; A61K 35/78; A61K 48/00; C07K 14/12; C12N 15/82

IPC 8 full level

A61K 36/81 (2006.01); A61K 39/165 (2006.01); A61P 37/04 (2006.01); C07K 14/12 (2006.01); C12N 15/82 (2006.01)

CPC (source: EP US)

A61K 39/12 (2013.01 - EP US); A61K 39/165 (2013.01 - EP US); A61P 37/04 (2018.01 - EP); C12N 15/8257 (2013.01 - EP US); A61K 2039/53 (2013.01 - EP US); A61K 2039/542 (2013.01 - EP US); A61K 2039/55544 (2013.01 - EP US); C07K 2319/02 (2013.01 - EP US); C12N 2760/18434 (2013.01 - EP US); Y02A 50/30 (2018.01 - EP US)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] US 5484719 A 19960116 - LAM DOMINIC M [US], et al
  • [Y] WO 9937784 A1 19990729 - CA MINISTER AGRICULTURE & FOOD [CA], et al
  • [Y] WO 9612801 A1 19960502 - TEXAS A & M UNIV SYS [US], et al
  • [Y] ARAKAWA T ET AL: "EFFICACY OF A FOOD PLANT-BASED ORAL CHOLERA TOXIN B SUBUNIT VACCINE", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING, US, vol. 16, March 1998 (1998-03-01), pages 292 - 297, XP002921639, ISSN: 1087-0156
  • [Y] ISRAEL Z R ET AL: "Combined systemic and mucosal immunization with microsphere-encapsulated inactivated simian immunodeficiency virus elicits serum, vaginal, and tracheal antibody responses in female rhesus macaques", AIDS RESEARCH AND HUMAN RETROVIRUSES, MARY ANN LIEBERT, US, vol. 15, no. 12, 10 August 1999 (1999-08-10), pages 1121 - 1136, XP002313912, ISSN: 0889-2229
  • [Y] CHATTARAJ S C ET AL: "Biodegradable microparticles of influenza viral vaccine: comparison of the effects of routes of administration on the in vivo immune response in mice.", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE : OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE CONTROLLED RELEASE SOCIETY. 29 MAR 1999, vol. 58, no. 2, 29 March 1999 (1999-03-29), pages 223 - 232, XP004164094, ISSN: 0168-3659
  • See also references of WO 0152886A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

DOCDB simple family (publication)

WO 0152886 A1 20010726; AU PQ520800 A0 20000217; CA 2402831 A1 20010726; EP 1409011 A1 20040421; EP 1409011 A4 20050921; US 2003191076 A1 20031009; ZA 200206657 B 20030820

DOCDB simple family (application)

AU 0100059 W 20010122; AU PQ520800 A 20000121; CA 2402831 A 20010122; EP 01901061 A 20010122; US 18163302 A 20021216; ZA 200206657 A 20020820