Global Patent Index - EP 1409341 B1

EP 1409341 B1 2004-12-15 - WATER JET DRIVE FOR MARINE VESSELS

Title (en)

WATER JET DRIVE FOR MARINE VESSELS

Title (de)

WASSERSTRAHLANTRIEB FÜR WASSERFAHRZEUGE

Title (fr)

PROPULSION PAR JET D'EAU POUR BATEAUX

Publication

EP 1409341 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 02762364 A

Priority

  • DE 10135543 A
  • EP 0207916 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10135543A1] The drive and control method uses at least one impeller (5) for providing a propulsion water jet which is deflected by guide surfaces (11,26,27,47,30) to allow sidewards and reverse movement. A crash-stop function is initiated by at least one sensor using the distance from a collision object, with a control (98) providing automatic lowering of a deflection cap providing braking via reverse propulsion. An Independent claim for propulsion drive and control device for a water vehicle is also included.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63H 11/10; B63H 11/11; B63H 11/117

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63H 11/107 (2006.01); B63H 11/117 (2006.01); B63H 25/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63H 11/117 (2013.01); B63H 11/107 (2013.01); B63H 25/42 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 10135543 A1 20030206; EP 1409341 A1 20040421; EP 1409341 B1 20041215; WO 03011685 A1 20030213

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50201805

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140731

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-02-08 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120201

2010-10-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100706

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-12-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050916

2005-01-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50201805 P 20050120

2005-01-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE NL

2004-12-15 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE NL

2004-05-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040116

2004-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-04-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI