Global Patent Index - EP 1410660 B8

EP 1410660 B8 2007-10-17 - MULTIMODAL SESSION SUPPORT ON DISTINCT MULTICHANNEL PROTOCOL

Title (en)

MULTIMODAL SESSION SUPPORT ON DISTINCT MULTICHANNEL PROTOCOL

Title (de)

MULTIMODALE SESSIONSUNTERSTÜTZUNG ÜBER BESTIMMTES MEHRKANALPROTOKOLL

Title (fr)

POSSIBILITE DE SESSION MULTIMODE PAR PROTOCOLE DISTINCT A CANAUX MULTIPLES

Publication

EP 1410660 B8 (EN)

Application

EP 02803267 A

Priority

  • US 0223077 W
  • US 30670401 P
  • US 9580302 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO03056859A2] An improved mechanism for sharing information between a non-voice session and a voice session is described. Clients use communication devices to exchange voice information over voice sessions to voice node servers and exchange non-voice information over non-voice sessions to WAP gateways. Information about the activity in a session is stored as context data. When a client switches from communication over one type of session to another, context data for that client is located and retrieved. The retrieved context data is used to recreate the state of the prior session, thus eliminating the need to reenter information that was previously available.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 13/00 (2006.01); H04L 29/08 (2006.01); H04W 76/04 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 76/041 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IE NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 03056859 A2 20030710; WO 03056859 A3 20031218; AU 2002365114 A1 20030715; AU 2002365114 B2 20071018; CA 2453583 A1 20030710; CA 2453583 C 20110503; CN 1259799 C 20060614; CN 1545818 A 20041110; DE 60219794 D1 20070606; DE 60219794 T2 20080124; EP 1410660 A2 20040421; EP 1410660 B1 20070425; EP 1410660 B8 20071017; HK 1061947 A1 20070928; JP 2005527132 A 20050908; JP 4131856 B2 20080813; US 7693541 B1 20100406

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170613

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-06-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160712

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160713

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160711

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-06-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070719

2008-04-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080128

2007-11-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-10-10 [RTI2] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: MULTIMODAL SESSION SUPPORT ON DISTINCT MULTICHANNEL PROTOCOL

2007-09-28 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1061947

2007-06-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60219794 P 20070606

2007-05-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2007-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE NL

2007-04-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-03-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SHAO, VICTOR

2007-03-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TUCKEY, CURTIS

2007-03-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CHONE, JEREMY

2005-07-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050131

2004-10-08 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1061947

2004-08-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SHAO, VICTOR

2004-08-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TUCKEY, CURTIS

2004-08-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CHONE, JEREMY

2004-04-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040120

2004-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-04-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI