Global Patent Index - EP 1412054 B1

EP 1412054 B1 2017-10-11 - TROPOSPHERIC VOLUME ELEMENTS ENRICHED WITH VITAL ELEMENTS AND/OR PROTECTIVE SUBSTANCES

Title (en)

TROPOSPHERIC VOLUME ELEMENTS ENRICHED WITH VITAL ELEMENTS AND/OR PROTECTIVE SUBSTANCES

Title (de)

MIT VITALELEMENTEN UND/ODER SCHUTZSTOFFEN ANGEREICHERTE TROPOSPHÄRISCHE RAUMELEMENTE

Title (fr)

ELEMENTS DE L'ESPACE TROPOSPHERIQUE ENRICHIS D'ELEMENTS VITAUX ET/OU DE SUBSTANCES PROTECTRICES

Publication

EP 1412054 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 02767058 A

Priority

  • DE 0202766 W
  • DE 10137178 A
  • DE 10213317 A
  • DE 10217932 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2005106061A1] Tropospheric volume elements enriched with vital elements and/or protective substances as well as procedures for their production and application. The term "vital elements" applies to all matter supporting the development of life within the earth's biosphere and the term "protective substances" means all those substances which contribute directly or indirectly to the prevention of harmful effects on the earth's biosphere and in particular on man. Tropospheric volume elements in the form of clouds which contain contaminants and which can escape from industrial facilities due to damage or malfunction are enriched with protective substances which prevent the organism from taking in radioactive elements and minimize the extent of the area affected by the clouds and possess additional warning and identification properties.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01D 57/00 (2006.01); C10L 1/10 (2006.01); B01D 53/00 (2006.01); C10L 1/12 (2006.01); C10L 1/18 (2006.01); C10L 1/188 (2006.01); C10L 1/20 (2006.01); C10L 1/24 (2006.01); C10L 1/26 (2006.01); C10L 1/28 (2006.01); C10L 1/30 (2006.01); C10L 3/00 (2006.01); C10L 9/10 (2006.01); C10L 10/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10L 1/1881 (2013.01); C10L 1/10 (2013.01); C10L 1/1208 (2013.01); C10L 1/1233 (2013.01); C10L 1/1241 (2013.01); C10L 1/1283 (2013.01); C10L 1/1814 (2013.01); C10L 1/201 (2013.01); C10L 1/2412 (2013.01); C10L 1/2431 (2013.01); C10L 1/2437 (2013.01); C10L 1/2641 (2013.01); C10L 1/28 (2013.01); C10L 1/301 (2013.01); C10L 1/305 (2013.01); C10L 3/003 (2013.01); C10L 9/10 (2013.01); C10L 10/02 (2013.01); Y10S 588/90 (2013.01); Y10S 588/901 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

US 2005106061 A1 20050519; US 7501103 B2 20090310; CN 100579630 C 20100113; CN 1617757 A 20050518; DE 10297668 D2 20050421; EP 1412054 A2 20040428; EP 1412054 B1 20171011; WO 03013698 A2 20030220; WO 03013698 A3 20030626

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180112

2018-05-31 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180111

2018-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-03-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-02-14 [REG NL MP] PATENT VOIDED (INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED)

- Effective date: 20171011

2017-11-16 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 50216258

2017-11-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 936015 T

- Effective date: 20171115

2017-11-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2017-10-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2017-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2017-10-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2017-05-24 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170428

2017-05-03 [INTC] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT (DELETED)

2016-12-14 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20161114

2016-10-19 [INTC] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT (DELETED)

2016-07-06 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20160606

2016-06-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10L 1/10 20060101AFI20160512BHEP

2016-06-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B01D 53/00 20060101ALI20160512BHEP

2016-05-12 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 50216258

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: B01D0053000000

- IPC: C10L0001100000

2008-10-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080912

2004-04-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040220

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI