Global Patent Index - EP 1413640 A4

EP 1413640 A4 2004-12-15 - FERRITIC STAINLESS STEEL FOR MEMBER OF EXHAUST GAS FLOW PASSAGE

Title (en)

FERRITIC STAINLESS STEEL FOR MEMBER OF EXHAUST GAS FLOW PASSAGE

Title (de)

FERRITISCHER NICHTROSTENDER STAHL FÜR EIN ELEMENT EINER ABGASSTROMPASSAGE

Title (fr)

ACIER INOXYDABLE FERRITIQUE POUR ELEMENT DE DEBIT DE GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT

Publication

EP 1413640 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 02743819 A

Priority

  • JP 0206768 W
  • JP 2001204444 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1413640A1] Ferritic stainless steel has a chemical composition, in mass %: C: 0.03% or less, Si: 1.0% or less, Mn: 1.5% or less, Ni: 0.6% or less, Cr: 10 to 20%, Nb: 0.50% or less, Cu: 0.8 to 2.0%, Al: 0.03% or less, V: 0.03 to 0.20%, N: 0.03% or less, provided that Nb is greater than or equals 8(C+N) is satisfied, and balance: Fe and inevitable impurities. The Mo content of the ferritic stainless steel as an impurity is preferably controlled to 0.10 mass% or less, and Ti and B may be optionally contained in amounts of 0.05 to 0.30 and 0.0005 to 0.02 mass%, respectively.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 38/00; C22C 38/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/02 (2006.01); C22C 38/04 (2006.01); C22C 38/42 (2006.01); C22C 38/44 (2006.01); C22C 38/46 (2006.01); C22C 38/48 (2006.01); C22C 38/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/02 (2013.01); C22C 38/004 (2013.01); C22C 38/04 (2013.01); C22C 38/42 (2013.01); C22C 38/44 (2013.01); C22C 38/46 (2013.01); C22C 38/48 (2013.01); C22C 38/50 (2013.01); C21D 2211/005 (2013.01); F01N 2530/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • No further relevant documents disclosed
  • See also references of WO 03004714A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH DE ES FR LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1413640 A1 20040428; EP 1413640 A4 20041215; EP 1413640 B1 20050525; CN 1225566 C 20051102; CN 1524130 A 20040825; DE 60204323 D1 20050630; DE 60204323 T2 20060126; ES 2240764 T3 20051016; JP 2008297631 A 20081211; JP 4197492 B2 20081217; JP 5138504 B2 20130206; JP WO2003004714 A1 20041028; KR 20040007764 A 20040124; US 2004170518 A1 20040902; US 2009053093 A1 20090226; US 2010119404 A1 20100513; US 2011176954 A1 20110721; WO 03004714 A1 20030116

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170719

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170825

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-07-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-05-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-03-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2240764 T3

2005-08-09 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-06-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60204323 P 20050630

2005-06-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-05-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR SE

2005-01-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR SE

2004-12-15 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20041028

2004-04-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031230

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI