Global Patent Index - EP 1413691 A3

EP 1413691 A3 2004-12-22 - Partition element for space division or decoration

Title (en)

Partition element for space division or decoration

Title (de)

Wandelement zur Raumgliederung oder Raumgestaltung

Title (fr)

Elément de cloison pour la division ou l'aménagement d'espaces

Publication

EP 1413691 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 03024280 A

Priority

DE 10249807 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1413691A2] The device, especially a mobile dividing wall, has a preferably sound insulating flat wall body (12) and a holding arrangement (14) for erecting and/or suspending the wall element in the room of a building. The wall body bounds at least one internal light chamber (16) and at least one electrical light source (18) is arranged in the chamber that radiates light outwards, at least in some areas, in operation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/74; F21V 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/74 (2006.01); F21V 33/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/7422 (2013.01); F21V 33/0012 (2013.01); E04B 2002/7488 (2013.01); F21Y 2115/10 (2016.08)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1413691 A2 20040428; EP 1413691 A3 20041222; DE 10249807 A1 20040513

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050623

2005-10-20 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-09-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK