Global Patent Index - EP 1413697 A3

EP 1413697 A3 2004-12-08 - Keep and lock assembly and keep for receiving locks

Title (en)

Keep and lock assembly and keep for receiving locks

Title (de)

Schliessblech und Schlosssystem bzw. Schliessblech für ein Schloss

Title (fr)

Système gâche - serrure et gâche pour serrure

Publication

EP 1413697 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 03256517 A

Priority

GB 0224924 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1413697A2] A keep rail 110 having a plurality of keeps 112, 114, 116 for engagement with respective portions of the door lock 122, 124, 126. The keeps 112, 114, 116 are arranged symmetrically with respect to a central axis of the keep rail which is perpendicular to the longitudinal axis of the keep rail. Thus the keep rail can be used on both left and right handed doors or windows by rotation of the keep rail about its axis of symmetry. <??>Also disclosed is a keep rail 200 having one or more keeps 202, 204, 206 and a plurality of slots 210, 212, 214, 216 through which elongate fixing means such as screws can be inserted. This makes it possible to fix the frame to the structure of the building after the keep rail has been mounted to the frame, even though the keep rail covers most of the frame. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 15/02; E05B 63/04; E05C 9/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 15/02 (2006.01); E05C 9/18 (2006.01); E05B 63/04 (2006.01); E05B 65/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 15/0245 (2013.01); E05B 15/022 (2013.01); E05C 9/1808 (2013.01); E05B 63/042 (2013.01); E05B 65/0811 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1413697 A2 20040428; EP 1413697 A3 20041208; GB 0224924 D0 20021204

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130503

2010-02-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100118

2006-11-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EPWIN GROUP LIMITED

2005-08-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-04-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050208

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK