Global Patent Index - EP 1415923 A3

EP 1415923 A3 2004-12-29 - A tray container and blank

Title (en)

A tray container and blank

Title (de)

Schale und Zuschnitt

Title (fr)

Plateau et découpe

Publication

EP 1415923 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 03024353 A

Priority

GB 0225017 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1415923A2] A tray comprises a base and opposed end and sidewalls hingedly connected to the base. it is made of foldable material having two opposing sides. The side or end wall(s) is a multi-ply structure having inside and outer surfaces expose the two sides of the foldable material, respectively. Independent claims are also included for: (a) a blank for forming a tray comprising a base panel (14) and opposed end and side wall panels (12, 16) hingedly connected to the base panel; and (b) a method of forming the multi-ply structure in the tray from the blank comprising folding second and third panels inwardly with respect to first panel so that second panel is in face contacting with the first panel, folding the third panel outwardly to the second panel to place the second and third panels in face contacting relationship to reveal the first surface of the foldable material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 5/28; B65D 5/20; B65D 5/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/20 (2006.01); B65D 5/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/2047 (2013.01); B65D 5/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1415923 A2 20040506; EP 1415923 A3 20041229; GB 0225017 D0 20021204

INPADOC legal status


2007-01-17 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060725

2005-09-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-07-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050523

2004-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK

2004-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65D 5/28 A

2004-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65D 5/20 B

2004-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65D 5/22 B

2004-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031024

2004-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-05-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK