Global Patent Index - EP 1419737 B9

EP 1419737 B9 2007-10-24 - Ultrasonic diagnostic apparatus

Title (en)

Ultrasonic diagnostic apparatus

Title (de)

Ultraschalldiagnostisches Gerät und Verfahren

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé de diagnostique à ultrasons

Publication

EP 1419737 B9 (EN)

Application

EP 03023959 A

Priority

JP 2002330856 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1419737A1] In an ultrasonic diagnostic apparatus capable of forming a three-dimensional ultrasonic image, an entire cavity portion of an organ can be displayed without any part being invisible. Three-dimensional ultrasonic image data obtained based on an ultrasonic wave transmitted and received with respect to an object organ is stored in a memory 20. With regard to the stored data, a brightness value of each voxel is binarized in a binarization processing section 24 using a predetermined threshold value. Then, the binarized brightness value is further inverted in a brightness value inverting section 26. Consequently, the cavity portion of the organ which has low brightness before inversion has high brightness, and the wall portion of the organ which has high brightness before inversion and which obstruct observation of the inner cavity portion has now low brightness. Thus, solid representation of the cavity portion to be observed can be obtained, thereby facilitating observation. <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 8/00 (2006.01); A61B 8/06 (2006.01); A61B 8/08 (2006.01); A61B 19/02 (2006.01); G06T 1/00 (2006.01); G06T 5/00 (2006.01); G06T 15/08 (2011.01); G06T 19/00 (2011.01); H04N 7/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61B 8/483 (2013.01); A61B 8/065 (2013.01); A61B 50/10 (2016.02); A61B 50/13 (2016.02)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1419737 A1 20040519; EP 1419737 B1 20070711; EP 1419737 B9 20071024; DE 60314822 D1 20070823; DE 60314822 T2 20080313; JP 2004159997 A 20040610; JP 3944059 B2 20070711; US 2004097808 A1 20040520; US 7223240 B2 20070529

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151102

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160503

2016-07-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151022

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151022

2016-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160630

2016-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151022

2016-05-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60314822

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141022

- Year of fee payment: 12

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141028

- Year of fee payment: 12

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141021

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140903

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-08-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20130614

2012-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111022

2011-10-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HITACHI ALOKA MEDICAL, LTD., JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALOKA CO. LTD., MITAKA, TOKIO/TOKYO, JP

- Document: DE 60314822

- Effective date: 20110826

2011-10-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60314822

- Representative's name: WEBER & HEIM PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20110826

2011-10-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60314822

- Representative's name: WEBER & HEIM PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFTSGESE, DE

- Effective date: 20110826

2011-09-09 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2008-06-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080414

2008-01-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-08-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60314822 P 20070823

2007-07-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-07-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-02-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040721

2004-07-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040519

2004-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-05-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK