EP 1420097 A1 20040519 - MICROFIBROUS NONWOVENS, COMPLEXES AND MANUFACTURING PROCESSES
Title (en)
MICROFIBROUS NONWOVENS, COMPLEXES AND MANUFACTURING PROCESSES
Title (de)
MIKROFASERVLIESSTOFFE, DEREN KOMPLEXE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN
Title (fr)
NON-TISSÉS MICROFIBREUX, COMPLEXES LES INCORPORANT, PRÉPARATIONS
Publication
Application
Priority
FR 0212807 A 20021015
Abstract (en)
The non-woven fabric has a fibrous structure containing a majority of microfibres (10) and thermally bonded zones (13). The micro fibres are made from one or more materials that have a higher melting point than the thermally-bonded fibres, and at least a proportion of them has an oblong cross-section. The fibrous structure also includes cellulose or non-cellulose fibres with a yarn count of under 1 dtex, and is made up of at least 20 per cent by weight of microfibres, at least 10 per cent of a thermal bonding material and at least 10 per cent of cellulose fibres. The weight of the fabric is between 5 and 600 g/sq m and preferably under 30 g/sq m, and it is impregnated to enhance its dust-free properties. The thermal bonding is carried out by passing the fabric through an oven, over heated rollers, or by ultrasound.
Abstract (fr)
La présente invention a pour objet : des non-tissés de fibres courtes, dont la structure fibreuse renferme une majorité en nombre de microfibres (1a, 1b ; 10) et des zones de matière fondue de thermoliage (3 ; 13), caractérisés en ce que lesdites microfibres (1a, 1b ; 10) sont en un(des) matériau(x) différent(s) de celui(ceux) de ladite matière fondue de thermoliage, présentant une(des) température(s) de fusion supérieure(s) et en ce que lesdites microfibres (1a, 1b ; 10) se trouvent, en limite desdites zones de matière fondue de thermoliage (3 ; 13), regroupées en faisceaux ; des complexes incorporant de tels non-tissés dans leur structure ; des procédés de préparation desdits non-tissés et complexes. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
D04H 1/42 (2012.01); D04H 1/46 (2012.01); D04H 1/48 (2012.01); D04H 1/49 (2012.01); D04H 1/54 (2012.01); D04H 1/541 (2012.01); D04H 1/542 (2012.01); D04H 1/544 (2012.01); D04H 1/549 (2012.01); D04H 1/55 (2012.01); D04H 1/555 (2012.01); D04H 1/58 (2012.01); D04H 1/74 (2006.01); D04H 13/00 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
D04H 1/425 (2013.01 - EP); D04H 1/43838 (2020.05 - EP US); D04H 1/43912 (2020.05 - EP US); D04H 1/46 (2013.01 - EP); D04H 1/48 (2013.01 - EP); D04H 1/49 (2013.01 - EP); D04H 1/54 (2013.01 - EP); D04H 1/5418 (2020.05 - EP US); D04H 1/542 (2013.01 - EP); D04H 1/544 (2013.01 - EP); D04H 1/549 (2013.01 - EP); D04H 1/55 (2013.01 - EP); D04H 1/555 (2013.01 - EP); D04H 1/58 (2013.01 - EP); D04H 1/74 (2013.01 - EP); D04H 13/00 (2013.01 - EP)
Citation (search report)
- [A] EP 1045059 A1 20001018 - FREUDENBERG CARL FA [DE]
- [A] EP 0834938 A2 19980408 - JAPAN VILENE CO LTD [JP]
- [A] EP 0205242 A2 19861217 - KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]
- [A] US 2001037850 A1 20011108 - MARMON SAMUEL EDWARD [US], et al
- [AD] WO 9823804 A1 19980604 - KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]
- [A] FR 2434224 A1 19800321 - MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US] & JP H06101148 A 19940412 - MITSUBISHI RAYON CO & JP H03152255 A 19910628 - JAPAN VILENE CO LTD & JP H08260316 A 19961008 - JAPAN VILENE CO LTD & JP H08246313 A 19960924 - KASAI KOGYO KK & JP H06158498 A 19940607 - TEIJIN LTD
- [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 199419, Derwent World Patents Index; Class A23, AN 1994-157101, XP002248752
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 0153, no. 77 (C - 0870) 24 September 1991 (1991-09-24)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 02 28 February 1997 (1997-02-28)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 01 31 January 1997 (1997-01-31)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 0184, no. 90 (C - 1249) 13 September 1994 (1994-09-13)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
FR 2845696 A1 20040416; FR 2845696 B1 20050513; EP 1420097 A1 20040519
DOCDB simple family (application)
FR 0212807 A 20021015; EP 03292546 A 20031014