EP 1420219 A1 20040519 - Condenser
Title (en)
Condenser
Title (de)
Kondensator
Title (fr)
Condensateur
Publication
Application
Priority
EP 02025460 A 20021115
Abstract (en)
Designed as a tube with a tube end (1), a collecting vessel (2) has the tube end sealed by a releasable drain plug (10) fixed on-axis by a locking ring (8). The tube end has a ring groove (7) for retaining the locking ring and a thickened threaded area, in which the ring groove fits.
Abstract (de)
Die Erfindung betrifft einen Kondensator mit einem Sammelbehälter insbesondere einer Klimaanlage für Kraftfahrzeuge, wobei der Sammelbehälter als Rohr (1) mit einem Rohrende ausgebildet ist, welches durch einen lösbaren, durch einen Sicherungsring (8) axial festgelegten Verschlussstopfen (10) verschließbar ist und welches eine Ringnut (7) zur Aufnahme des Sicherungsringes aufweist. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
F25B 39/04 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
F25B 39/04 (2013.01); F25B 2400/162 (2013.01); F25B 2500/01 (2013.01); F28F 2220/00 (2013.01)
Citation (applicant)
- DE 10039260 A1 20010322 - BEHR GMBH & CO [DE]
- DE 4402927 A1 19950803 - BEHR GMBH & CO [DE]
Citation (search report)
- [Y] US 6446714 B1 20020910 - KASPAR MARTIN [DE], et al
- [Y] EP 1249672 A2 20021016 - SANDEN CORP [JP]
- [XA] US 6223556 B1 20010501 - DE KEUSTER RICHARD M [US], et al
- [A] FR 1263013 A 19610605 - PHOENIX RHEINROHR AG
- [A] NL 287908 A
- [A] DE 3338822 A1 19850509 - TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]
- [AD] DE 10039260 A1 20010322 - BEHR GMBH & CO [DE]
- [AD] EP 0669506 A1 19950830 - BEHR GMBH & CO [DE]
- [XAY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 19 5 June 2001 (2001-06-05)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 26 1 July 2002 (2002-07-01)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 20 10 July 2001 (2001-07-10)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1420219 A1 20040519; EP 1420219 B1 20070502; AT E361451 T1 20070515; DE 50210081 D1 20070614; ES 2286190 T3 20071201
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 02025460 A 20021115; AT 02025460 T 20021115; DE 50210081 T 20021115; ES 02025460 T 20021115