Global Patent Index - EP 1421987 A3

EP 1421987 A3 2009-02-25 - Method and system for regenerating nox adsorbers and/or particulate filters

Title (en)

Method and system for regenerating nox adsorbers and/or particulate filters

Title (de)

Verfahren und System zur Regenerierung von NOx Adsorbern und/oder von Partikelfiltern

Title (fr)

Méthode et sytème pour régenérer des adsorbants de NOx et /ou des filtres à particules

Publication

EP 1421987 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 03078334 A

Priority

US 30145502 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1421987A2] An active system (10) for regenerating a NO x adsorber (32) and a particulate filter (34), the system (10) comprising a fuel source (12), a reformer (16) for generating hydrogen and carbon monoxide in fluid communication with the fuel source (12), a first valve (22), a second valve (24), and a third valve (26) in fluid communication with the reformer (16), an oxidation catalyst (30), a NO x adsorber (32) located downstream from the oxidation catalyst (30), a particulate filter (36) located downstream from the NO x adsorber (32); and wherein the first valve (22), the second valve (24), and the third valve (26) control fluid flow from the reformer (16) to the oxidation catalyst (30), the NO x adsorber (32), and the particulate filter (36).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01D 53/94 (2006.01); C01B 3/38 (2006.01); F01N 3/023 (2006.01); F01N 3/035 (2006.01); F01N 3/08 (2006.01); F01N 3/20 (2006.01); F01N 13/02 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C01B 3/386 (2013.01); B01D 53/9477 (2013.01); B01D 53/9495 (2013.01); F01N 3/0231 (2013.01); F01N 3/035 (2013.01); F01N 3/0885 (2013.01); F01N 3/103 (2013.01); F01N 13/0097 (2014.06); F01N 13/011 (2014.06); F01N 13/02 (2013.01); B01D 2251/202 (2013.01); B01D 2251/204 (2013.01); C01B 2203/0261 (2013.01); C01B 2203/1685 (2013.01); F01N 2240/30 (2013.01); F01N 2250/14 (2013.01); F01N 2610/03 (2013.01); F01N 2610/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV MK

EPO simple patent family

EP 1421987 A2 20040526; EP 1421987 A3 20090225; EP 1421987 B1 20160525; US 2004098977 A1 20040527; US 2004216451 A1 20041104; US 2005103001 A1 20050519; US 6832473 B2 20041221; US 7093428 B2 20060822; US 7584603 B2 20090908

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171022

2018-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20180501

2018-07-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180629

2018-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20171022

2018-05-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60348973

2017-05-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20170228

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170125

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-02-28 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60348973

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161027

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161027

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-01-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-07-07 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 60348973

2016-05-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2016-05-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2016-01-13 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20151218

2011-05-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20110405

2009-11-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090825

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK

2004-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-05-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK