Global Patent Index - EP 1425998 B9

EP 1425998 B9 2007-10-17 - BODY SUPPORTER

Title (en)

BODY SUPPORTER

Title (de)

KÖRPERSTÜTZE

Title (fr)

SUPPORT DE CORPS

Publication

EP 1425998 B9 (EN)

Application

EP 02765473 A

Priority

  • JP 0209196 W
  • JP 2001274248 A
  • JP 2001360074 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1425998A1] A body support assembly in which irregular portions such as bunchy portions and irregular portions are prevented and further curing and holding performance are improved. The body support assembly (1) comprises a flexible cushion body (2) covered with a sheet-shaped cover body (3) impregnated with a curing resin and the cushion body (2) is made to abut against a user's body to be deformed in a shape matching the user's body, and then the cover body (3) is cured to be used. At least an upper edge portion of the cover body (3) is formed in a thinned edge portion (7) decreasing in thickness gradually from the cushion body (2). The thinned edge portion (7) includes a flange-shaped junction (6) formed by making a side for covering one surface of the cushion body (2) and a side for covering the other surface thereof abut against each other in an upper edge portion of the cover body (3) to be join together. <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 27/00 (2006.01); A47C 7/02 (2006.01); A47C 7/46 (2006.01); A47C 27/14 (2006.01); B60N 2/66 (2006.01); B60N 2/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 7/46 (2013.01); A47C 7/022 (2013.01); B60N 2/66 (2013.01); B60N 2/7017 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1425998 A1 20040609; EP 1425998 A4 20041208; EP 1425998 B1 20070530; EP 1425998 B9 20071017; CN 1241511 C 20060215; CN 1553781 A 20041208; DE 60220421 D1 20070712; DE 60220421 T2 20080131; KR 100871271 B1 20081128; KR 20040036937 A 20040503; WO 03022102 A1 20030320

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091001

- Year of fee payment: 8

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100909

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60220421

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-06-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100909

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090630

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090902

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-05-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080303

2007-11-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-07-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60220421 P 20070712

2007-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-05-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-09-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060616

2005-03-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-12-08 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20041021

2004-06-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040327

2004-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-06-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI