Global Patent Index - EP 1427316 B1

EP 1427316 B1 2004-12-29 - PLATE MADE OF PLASTIC MATERIAL AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PLATE

Title (en)

PLATE MADE OF PLASTIC MATERIAL AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PLATE

Title (de)

TELLER AUS KUNSTSTOFFMATERIAL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES TELLERS

Title (fr)

ASSIETTE EN MATIERE PLASTIQUE ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UNE ASSIETTE

Publication

EP 1427316 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 02774137 A

Priority

  • AT 0200263 W
  • AT 14672001 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO03024286A1] The invention relates to a plate (1) made of plastic material, particularly a plate for small children, with a cavity (5), which is provided between a food surface (2) and a bottom surface (3), and with a closeable opening (6) for filling the cavity (5) with a temperature control medium. The plate (1) is blown as one piece with the opening (6), whose axis is essentially parallel to the plane defined by the bottom surface (3) and which is situated in a lateral outer surface (4) that joins the food and bottom surfaces (2, 3). The invention also relates to a method for producing a plate (1) of the aforementioned type during which the plastic material is shaped, as a single piece, into a plate (1) while simultaneously producing an opening (6) situated in a lateral outer surface (4) that joins the food and bottom surfaces (2, 3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 19/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 19/02 (2006.01); B29C 49/02 (2006.01); B65D 1/00 (2006.01); B29L 22/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 19/027 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 03024286 A1 20030327; AT 413258 B 20060115; AT A14672001 A 20050615; BR 0211330 A 20040928; BR 0211330 B1 20101214; DE 50201925 D1 20050203; EP 1427316 A1 20040616; EP 1427316 B1 20041229; JP 2005501682 A 20050120; US 2004173617 A1 20040909

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170928

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170802

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-05-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50201925

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE WEICKMANN & WEICKMANN, DE

2015-05-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50201925

- Representative's name: WEICKMANN & WEICKMANN PATENTANWAELTE - RECHTSA, DE

2015-05-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50201925

- Representative's name: WEICKMANN & WEICKMANN PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAEL, DE

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: BAMED AG

- Free text: BAMED AG#HINTERFELD 3B#8852 ALTENDORF (CH) -TRANSFER TO- BAMED AG#HINTERFELD 3B#8852 ALTENDORF (CH)

2005-12-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-04-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-04-26 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-02-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50201925 P 20050203

2005-01-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2004-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI SE

2004-12-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-12-29 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI SE

2004-06-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040213

2004-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR