Global Patent Index - EP 1428982 B1

EP 1428982 B1 2009-02-04 - A method of depositing a local MCrAIY-coating

Title (en)

A method of depositing a local MCrAIY-coating

Title (de)

Verfahren zur selektiven Abscheidung einer MCrAlY-Beschichtung

Title (fr)

Méthode pour déposer localement un revêtement de type MCrAlY

Publication

EP 1428982 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 02406066 A

Priority

EP 02406066 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1428982A1] It is disclosed a method of depositing a MCrAlY-coating (6) on the surface (5) of a single crystal (SX) or directionally solidified (DS) article (1), wherein the article (1) is coated only at a local area by an electroplated method. <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/28 (2006.01); C23C 30/00 (2006.01); C25D 5/02 (2006.01); C25D 7/00 (2006.01); F01D 9/02 (2006.01); F01D 25/00 (2006.01); F02C 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25D 5/022 (2013.01); C23C 30/00 (2013.01); F01D 5/288 (2013.01); F05D 2230/80 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1428982 A1 20040616; EP 1428982 B1 20090204; DE 60231084 D1 20090319; JP 2004190140 A 20040708; US 2004159552 A1 20040819

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ANSALDO ENERGIA SWITZERLAND AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 60231084

2017-10-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60231084

- Representative's name: ROESLER, UWE, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161213

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-08-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 60231084

2016-08-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ANSALDO ENERGIA SWITZERLAND AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 60231084

2016-08-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60231084

- Representative's name: ROESLER, UWE, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

2010-01-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091105

2009-03-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60231084 P 20090319

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

2006-07-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060620

2005-03-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE

2005-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041112

2004-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-06-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO