Global Patent Index - EP 1431051 B1

EP 1431051 B1 2009-02-11 - Ink jet recording element and printing method

Title (en)

Ink jet recording element and printing method

Title (de)

Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungselement und Druckverfahren

Title (fr)

Elément d'enregistrement par jet d'encre et méthode d'impression

Publication

EP 1431051 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 03078824 A

Priority

  • US 32029302 A
  • US 32020602 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1431051A2] An ink jet recording element and printing method having a support having thereon an image-receiving layer of a polymeric network formed by a chemical reaction between a wet-strength polymer, amino-functionalized inorganic particles and a hydrophilic polymer other than a wet-strength polymer.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/01 (2006.01); B41M 5/00 (2006.01); B41M 5/50 (2006.01); B41M 5/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/52 (2013.01); B41M 5/5218 (2013.01); B41M 5/5236 (2013.01); B41M 5/5254 (2013.01); B41M 5/529 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1431051 A2 20040623; EP 1431051 A3 20060315; EP 1431051 B1 20090211; DE 60326117 D1 20090326; JP 2004195980 A 20040715

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131204

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-10-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60326117

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-09-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140829

2014-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131204

2014-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60326117

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121221

- Year of fee payment: 10

2013-03-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121219

- Year of fee payment: 10

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121128

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-01-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091112

2009-03-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60326117 P 20090326

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-02-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-11-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061009

2006-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060809

2006-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK

2004-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-06-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK