Global Patent Index - EP 1431184 B1

EP 1431184 B1 2007-10-24 - Cigarettes packaging apparatus

Title (en)

Cigarettes packaging apparatus

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Verpacken von Zigaretten

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour l'emballage des cigarettes

Publication

EP 1431184 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 03027917 A

Priority

DE 10259219 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1431184A2] Cigarette packing device has a cigarette magazine (11) that forms part of a packing machine and comprises an upper storage reservoir (12) together with a number of shaft units (15) for holding cigarette groups (16). At a distance above the shaft units is a transverse control unit (24) with a multiplicity of control shafts (25) that allow the passage of individual cigarettes. The content of the control shafts is measured so that misaligned cigarettes (22) can be detected and generate an error signal, so that the cigarette causing the blockage can be removed without interrupting cigarette supply to the cigarette shafts (13).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 19/30 (2006.01); A24C 5/34 (2006.01); B65B 19/28 (2006.01); B65B 19/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 19/28 (2013.01); B65B 19/105 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1431184 A2 20040623; EP 1431184 A3 20051116; EP 1431184 B1 20071024; DE 10259219 A1 20040715; DE 50308455 D1 20071206

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 15

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171220

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161204

2017-08-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161204

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151202

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-10-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080725

2007-12-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20071121

2007-12-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50308455 P 20071206

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2007-10-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-07-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2006-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060125

2005-11-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-11-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK

2005-11-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65B 19/30 A

2005-11-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65B 19/28 B

2005-11-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 24C 5/34 B

2004-11-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FOCKE & CO. (GMBH & CO. KG)

2004-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-06-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK