Global Patent Index - EP 1431482 A3

EP 1431482 A3 2007-10-24 - Motor vehicle door lock

Title (en)

Motor vehicle door lock

Title (de)

Kraftfahrzeug-Türschloss

Title (fr)

Serrure de porte pour véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 1431482 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 03025227 A

Priority

DE 10258646 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10258646B3] Motor vehicle door lock comprises lock elements such as a latch and a detent pawl, and a lock mechanism. The door lock also comprises an adjusting element (4) having a first (5) and a second engaging arrangement (6). The two engaging arrangements are designed and arranged on the adjusting element so that after the locking process and after the unlocking process the second engaging arrangement lies in an engaging position and leaves the engaging position immediately after the opening process. An Independent claim is also included for an alternative motor vehicle door lock. Preferred Features: The second engaging arrangement has at least two, preferably two, engaging elements (7, 8). When the second engaging arrangement is in the engaging position, one of the engaging elements directly engages with the opening device.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/20 (2006.01); E05B 47/00 (2006.01); E05B 65/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 81/06 (2013.01); E05B 77/26 (2013.01); E05B 77/28 (2013.01); E05B 81/14 (2013.01); E05B 81/62 (2013.01); E05B 85/01 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV MK

EPO simple patent family

DE 10258646 B3 20040519; EP 1431482 A2 20040623; EP 1431482 A3 20071024; EP 2034112 A1 20090311

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-04-24 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20130402

2008-10-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080926

2008-07-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080424

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK

2004-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-06-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK