Global Patent Index - EP 1431858 A3

EP 1431858 A3 2007-10-24 - Method, computer program and power supply apparatus for stabilizing a supply voltage for at least one consumer

Title (en)

Method, computer program and power supply apparatus for stabilizing a supply voltage for at least one consumer

Title (de)

Verfahren, Computerprogramm und Spannungsversorgungsvorrichtung zur Stabilisierung einer Versorgungsspannung für mindestens einen Verbraucher

Title (fr)

Appareil d'alimentation, procédé et programme d'ordinateur pour la stabilisation d'alimentation pour au moins un consommateur

Publication

EP 1431858 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 03028913 A

Priority

DE 10261770 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1431858A2] Part of a buffer task performed by capacitors is saved. If instabilities, especially in the form of voltage collapse, are determined during input voltage (UE) for a voltage control device, single electronic consumers (A,B) switch to an energy-saving mode and charge an electronic control device (120), from which they each receive their supply voltages (UA,UB). Independent claims are also included for the following: (a) A software program for a control device in a motor vehicle; (b) and for an electronic circuit for a control device in a motor vehicle; (c) and for a voltage supply device for making a stabilized supply voltage available for electronic consumers in a motor vehicle.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G05F 1/565 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05F 1/565 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV MK

EPO simple patent family

EP 1431858 A2 20040623; EP 1431858 A3 20071024; EP 1431858 B1 20140416; DE 10261770 A1 20040708

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161229

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161215

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-12-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-12-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2015-04-30 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 50315017

- Effective date: 20150119

2015-03-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20150119

2015-01-19 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 50315017

2014-05-28 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 50315017

- Effective date: 20140528

2014-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2013-12-04 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20131106

2008-07-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2008-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080304

2008-03-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080126

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK

2004-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-06-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK