Global Patent Index - EP 1435503 B1

EP 1435503 B1 2009-02-11 - Heat exchanger and heat exchanger assembly for vehicles

Title (en)

Heat exchanger and heat exchanger assembly for vehicles

Title (de)

Wärmeübertrager sowie Wärmeübertrageranordnung für ein Kraftfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Echangeur de chaleur et ensemble échangeur de chaleur pour véhicules automobiles

Publication

EP 1435503 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 04008664 A

Priority

  • DE 19722097 A
  • EP 98107377 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0881447A2] The heat transfer assembly (2-19) is designed for use in a vehicle. It consists of a rib or tube block with flat tubes and expanded tube ends at opposite sides. The adjacent lateral wall sections of the tube ends lie against each other in a positive fit. The longitudinal wall sections of the tube ends, against the flow boxes, are in a positive fit against their facing flow box wall sections.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60K 11/04 (2006.01); F28D 1/04 (2006.01); F28D 1/053 (2006.01); F28F 1/00 (2006.01); F28F 1/02 (2006.01); F28F 9/02 (2006.01); F28F 9/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 1/025 (2013.01); F28D 1/0435 (2013.01); F28F 9/0221 (2013.01); F28F 9/16 (2013.01); F28D 2021/0082 (2013.01); F28D 2021/0084 (2013.01); F28D 2021/0094 (2013.01); F28F 2009/004 (2013.01); F28F 2275/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0881447 A2 19981202; EP 0881447 A3 19990623; EP 0881447 B1 20040818; DE 19722097 A1 19981203; DE 59814344 D1 20090326; EP 1435503 A2 20040707; EP 1435503 A3 20051026; EP 1435503 B1 20090211; ES 2226025 T3 20050316; JP H1114271 A 19990122; US 6012512 A 20000111

INPADOC legal status


2012-02-23 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59814344

- Effective date: 20111101

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111101

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090211

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100511

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090511

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2010-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090511

2010-01-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-01-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091112

2009-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090511

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090522

2009-03-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59814344 P 20090326

2009-02-11 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0881447 P

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2009-02-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060627

2006-07-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060627

2006-07-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2006-07-05 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20060426

- Countries: AL

2006-07-05 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20060426

- Countries: LT

2006-07-05 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20060426

- Countries: LV

2006-07-05 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20060426

- Countries: MK

2006-07-05 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20060426

- Countries: SI

2006-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060327

2005-10-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2005-10-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK SI

2004-12-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BEHR GMBH & CO. KG

2004-07-07 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0881447 P

2004-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2004-07-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK SI