Global Patent Index - EP 1435910 B9

EP 1435910 B9 2010-02-03 - NOVEL CYCLOSPORIN ANALOG MICROEMULSION PRECONCENTRATES

Title (en)

NOVEL CYCLOSPORIN ANALOG MICROEMULSION PRECONCENTRATES

Title (de)

NEUE CYCLOSPORIN-ANALOGE MIKROEMULSIONSVORKONZENTRATE

Title (fr)

NOUVEAUX PRECONCENTRES EN MICROEMULSION D'ANALOGUES DE CYCLOSPORINE

Publication

EP 1435910 B9 (EN)

Application

EP 02801263 A

Priority

  • CA 0201561 W
  • US 34620101 P
  • US 37059702 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO03032949A1] The present invention relates to formulations containing cyclosporin analogs that are structurally similar to cyclosporin A, in particular isomeric mixtures of cyclosporin analogs that are structurally similar to cyclosporin A. The formulations form stable microemulsion preconcentrates and may provide superior drug bioavailability and/or may reduce one or more adverse effects associated with the administration of cyclosporin. Also disclosed are methods for using and preparing the formulations.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/10 (2006.01); A61K 9/107 (2006.01); A61K 9/00 (2006.01); A61K 9/48 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/13 (2006.01); A61K 47/10 (2006.01); A61K 47/14 (2006.01); A61K 47/22 (2006.01); A61K 47/30 (2006.01); A61K 47/34 (2006.01); A61K 47/44 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/1075 (2013.01); A61K 9/0095 (2013.01); A61K 9/4858 (2013.01); A61K 38/13 (2013.01); A61K 47/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV MK RO SI

EPO simple patent family

WO 03032949 A1 20030424; AR 036852 A1 20041006; AT 437629 T 20090815; AU 2002333098 B2 20060316; BR 0213661 A 20041026; CA 2461730 A1 20030424; CA 2461730 C 20120515; CN 1274294 C 20060913; CN 1571657 A 20050126; CO 5580835 A2 20051130; DE 60233150 D1 20090910; DK 1435910 T3 20091109; EP 1435910 A1 20040714; EP 1435910 B1 20090729; EP 1435910 B9 20100203; EP 2116228 A1 20091111; ES 2330625 T3 20091214; HK 1062525 A1 20100326; HR P20040354 A2 20050228; HR P20040354 B1 20121031; IL 160761 A 20101130; IL 160761 D0 20040831; IL 195892 A 20130930; JP 2005506990 A 20050310; JP 2009073850 A 20090409; JP 2012158609 A 20120823; KR 100978836 B1 20100830; KR 20050037418 A 20050421; MA 26221 A1 20040701; ME P89008 A 20111220; MX PA04003623 A 20041202; MY 145753 A 20120330; NO 20042028 A 20040514; NZ 531946 A 20050930; PL 206018 B1 20100630; PL 370560 A1 20050530; PT 1435910 E 20090907; RU 2004110936 A 20050527; RU 2317067 C2 20080220; TN SN04070 A1 20060601; US 2003171264 A1 20030911; US 2006217309 A1 20060928; US 2009054311 A1 20090226; US 2011136744 A1 20110609; US 2014249092 A1 20140904; US 7060672 B2 20060613; US 7429562 B2 20080930; US 7829533 B2 20101109; ZA 200402268 B 20050525

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170922

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-09-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-08-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141017

2017-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20161007

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161018

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161010

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161031

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-12-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: AURINIA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., CA

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AURINIA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., CA

2016-09-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-10-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141031

2015-10-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141017

2015-10-09 [REG FR RM] CORRECTION OF A MATERIAL ERROR

- Effective date: 20150907

2015-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-08-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150505

2015-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141017

2015-07-31 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141017

2015-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141017

2015-07-31 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141017

2015-07-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150417

2015-07-29 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2015-07-01 [REG SK MM4A] PATENT LAPSED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF MAINTENANCE FEES

- Document: SK E 6145

- Effective date: 20141017

2015-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141031

2015-06-24 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20090402442

- Effective date: 20150505

2015-06-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 437629 T

- Effective date: 20141017

2015-06-08 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: AURINIA PHARMACEUTICALS INC.

- Effective date: 20150601

2015-05-29 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141031

2015-05-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141017

2015-05-29 [REG CH PK] CORRECTION

- Free text: BERICHTIGUNG INHABER

2015-05-26 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20141031

2015-05-26 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AURINIA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., VICTORIA, CA

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AURINIA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VICTORIA, BRITISH COLUMBIA, CA

- Document: DE 60233150

2015-05-26 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60233150

- Representative's name: HASELTINE LAKE LLP, DE

2015-05-25 [REG LT MM9D] CANCELLATION OF EXTENSION OF EUROPEAN PATENT

- Effective date: 20141017

2015-05-20 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-05-15 [REG CH PK] CORRECTION

- Free text: BERICHTIGUNG INHABER

2015-04-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: AURINIA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, CA

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ISOTECHNIKA PHARMA INC., CA

2015-04-24 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20150417

2014-09-19 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20140819

2014-09-19 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: AURINIA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CA

- Effective date: 20140819

2014-08-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AURINIA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VICTORIA, CA

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ISOTECHNIKA PHARMA ,INC., EDMONTON, ALBERTA, CA

- Document: DE 60233150

- Effective date: 20140708

2014-08-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AURINIA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., VICTORIA, CA

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ISOTECHNIKA PHARMA ,INC., EDMONTON, ALBERTA, CA

- Document: DE 60233150

- Effective date: 20140708

2014-08-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60233150

- Representative's name: HASELTINE LAKE LLP, DE

- Effective date: 20140708

2014-07-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60233150

- Representative's name: HASELTINE LAKE LLP, DE

2014-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20131202

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-02-28 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20131031

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-02-28 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20131030

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-02-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20131126

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-02-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20131105

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20131126

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-01-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20131030

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-01-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20131031

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-01-31 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20131128

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-01-31 [PGFP SK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Payment date: 20131016

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-01-31 [PGFP CZ] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Payment date: 20131016

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-12-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20131105

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-12-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20131126

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-12-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: ISOTECHNIKA PHARMA INC., CA

- Document: AT 437629 T

- Effective date: 20121107

2012-10-30 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: ISOTECHNIKA PHARMA INC.

- Effective date: 20121018

2011-10-26 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: PALADIN LABS INC., CA

- Effective date: 20110905

2011-10-26 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ISOTECHNIKA PHARMA INC., CA

- Effective date: 20110930

2011-10-19 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110922 AND 20110928

2011-10-14 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: PALADIN LABS INC.

- Free text: ISOTECHNIKA INC.#5120-75 STREET#EDMONTON, AB T6E 6W2 (CA) -TRANSFER TO- PALADIN LABS INC.#6111 ROYALMOUNT, SUITE 102#MONTREAL, QUEBEC H4P 2T4 (CA)

2011-10-14 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ISOTECHNIKA PHARMA INC.

- Free text: PALADIN LABS INC.#6111 ROYALMOUNT, SUITE 102#MONTREAL, QUEBEC H4P 2T4 (CA) -TRANSFER TO- ISOTECHNIKA PHARMA INC.#5120-75TH STREET#EDMONTON, AB T6E 6W2 (CA)

2011-09-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090729

2011-09-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AURINIA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VICTORIA, CA

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ISOTECHNIKA,INC., EDMONTON, ALBERTA, CA

- Document: DE 60233150

- Effective date: 20110712

2011-09-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AURINIA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., VICTORIA, CA

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ISOTECHNIKA,INC., EDMONTON, ALBERTA, CA

- Document: DE 60233150

- Effective date: 20110712

2011-09-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60233150

- Representative's name: HASELTINE LAKE LLP, DE

- Effective date: 20110712

2011-08-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: ISOTECHNIKA PHARMA INC.5120 - 75TH STREET,EDMONTON

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-08-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: ISOTECHNIKA PHARMA INC.

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-08-10 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20110728

2011-07-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60233150

- Representative's name: HASELTINE LAKE LLP, DE

2010-07-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100503

2010-04-30 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090729

2010-03-31 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091029

2010-03-26 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1062525

2010-01-07 [REG SK T3] TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION INTO SLOVAKIAN

- Document: SK E 6145

2009-12-14 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2330625 T3

2009-11-19 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20090402442

2009-11-09 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2009-11-03 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2009-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MOINAS & SAVOYE SA

2009-09-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60233150 P 20090910

2009-09-07 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20090831

2009-08-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2009-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-07-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2009-07-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2009-07-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-06-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ISOTECHNIKA INC.

2007-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041020

2004-12-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041020

2004-11-12 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1062525

2004-07-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040512

2004-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-07-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI