Global Patent Index - EP 1438717 B8

EP 1438717 B8 2007-10-10 - AN OPTICAL DISC WITH DIFFERENT WOBBLE PATTERNS IN DIFFERENT GROOVES

Title (en)

AN OPTICAL DISC WITH DIFFERENT WOBBLE PATTERNS IN DIFFERENT GROOVES

Title (de)

OPTISCHE PLATTE MIT VERSCHIEDEN GEWOBBELTEN RILLEN

Title (fr)

DISQUE OPTIQUE PRESENTANT DES SILLONS AVEC DIFFERENTS MOTIFS ONDULES

Publication

EP 1438717 B8 (EN)

Application

EP 02777849 A

Priority

  • JP 0210721 W
  • JP 2001318381 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US7167438B2] The S/N ratio is improved for recording data to grooves ( 2 - 1,2 - 2 ) of an optical disc so that as much information as possible can be recorded at the lowest possible frequency band. An optical disc using wobble patterns to record different information has a first groove ( 2 - 1 ) having a first wobble pattern ( 22 ) in which one wobble period has a sharp rising edge and a gradual falling edge; and a second groove ( 2 - 2 ) having a second wobble pattern ( 24 ) in which one wobble period has a gradual rising edge and a sharp falling edge. Each of the first and the second wobble pattern is represented by a first fundamental and a second harmonic of a Fourier series. The polarity of the second harmonic, which is an even harmonic, of the second wobble pattern is opposite that of the first wobble pattern. A method for manufacturing this optical disc is also provided.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G11B 7/24082 (2013.01); G11B 7/007 (2006.01); G11B 7/26 (2006.01); G11B 27/19 (2006.01); G11B 27/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11B 7/007 (2013.01); G11B 7/24082 (2013.01); G11B 27/24 (2013.01); G11B 2220/216 (2013.01); G11B 2220/218 (2013.01); G11B 2220/2529 (2013.01); G11B 2220/2545 (2013.01); G11B 2220/2562 (2013.01); G11B 2220/2575 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

US 2005058056 A1 20050317; US 7167438 B2 20070123; AT 315824 T 20060215; BR 0213330 A 20041013; BR PI0213330 B1 20150908; CA 2460763 A1 20030424; CA 2460763 C 20120207; CN 1279521 C 20061011; CN 1610939 A 20050427; DE 60208708 D1 20060406; DE 60208708 T2 20060824; DE 60208708 T8 20071031; EP 1438717 A1 20040721; EP 1438717 B1 20060111; EP 1438717 B8 20071010; HU 0401650 A2 20041129; HU 225436 B1 20061228; JP 2003123320 A 20030425; JP 4068330 B2 20080326; KR 100894941 B1 20090427; KR 20040062563 A 20040707; MX PA04003193 A 20051212; PL 204556 B1 20100129; PL 368679 A1 20050404; WO 03034415 A1 20030424

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170918

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-10-31 [PGFP SK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Payment date: 20170918

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-09-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161012

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161011

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-01-31 [PGFP CZ] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Payment date: 20161003

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160913

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-09-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-06-01 [REG SK PC4A] ASSIGNMENT AND TRANSFER OF RIGHTS

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V., EINDHOVEN, NL

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V., EINDHOVEN, NL; PANASONIC CORPORATION, OSAKA, JP; SONY CORPORATION, MINATO-KU, TOKYO, JP

- Document: SK E 603

- Effective date: 20150831

2016-06-01 [REG SK PC4A] ASSIGNMENT AND TRANSFER OF RIGHTS

- Owner name: PANASONIC CORPORATION, OSAKA, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V., EINDHOVEN, NL; PANASONIC CORPORATION, OSAKA, JP; SONY CORPORATION, MINATO-KU, TOKYO, JP

- Document: SK E 603

- Effective date: 20150831

2016-06-01 [REG SK TC4A] CHANGE OF OWNER'S NAME

- Owner name: SONY CORPORATION, MINATO-KU, TOKYO, JP

- Document: SK E 603

- Effective date: 20160520

2016-06-01 [REG SK TC4A] CHANGE OF OWNER'S NAME

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V., EINDHOVEN, NL

- Document: SK E 603

- Effective date: 20160520

2016-06-01 [REG SK TC4A] CHANGE OF OWNER'S NAME

- Owner name: PANASONIC CORPORATION, OSAKA, JP

- Document: SK E 603

- Effective date: 20160520

2016-05-20 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: PANASONIC CORPORATION, JP

- Effective date: 20160420

2016-05-20 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V., NL

- Effective date: 20160420

2016-05-20 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: PANASONIC CORPORATION, JP

- Effective date: 20160420

2016-05-20 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V., NL

- Effective date: 20160420

2016-03-30 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20160303 AND 20160309

2016-03-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PANASONIC CORPORATION, KADOMA-SHI, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V., EINDHOVEN, NL; PANASONIC CORPORATION, KADOMA-SHI, OSAKA, JP; SONY CORPORATION, TOKIO/TOKYO, JP

- Document: DE 60208708

2016-03-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V., NL

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V., EINDHOVEN, NL; PANASONIC CORPORATION, KADOMA-SHI, OSAKA, JP; SONY CORPORATION, TOKIO/TOKYO, JP

- Document: DE 60208708

2016-03-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60208708

- Representative's name: EISENFUEHR SPEISER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAEL, DE

2015-09-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-09-05 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20140806

2014-09-05 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N

- Effective date: 20140806

2014-09-05 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO LTD, JP

- Effective date: 20140806

2014-09-05 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: SONY CORPORATION, JP

- Effective date: 20140806

2013-08-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PANASONIC CORPORATION, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS, PANASONIC CORPORATION, SONY CORP., , JP

- Document: DE 60208708

- Effective date: 20130614

2013-08-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V., NL

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS, PANASONIC CORPORATION, SONY CORP., , JP

- Document: DE 60208708

- Effective date: 20130614

2013-08-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SONY CORP., JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS, PANASONIC CORPORATION, SONY CORP., , JP

- Document: DE 60208708

- Effective date: 20130614

2013-08-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SONY CORPORATION, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS, PANASONIC CORPORATION, SONY CORPORATION, , JP

- Document: DE 60208708

- Effective date: 20130614

2013-08-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PANASONIC CORPORATION, KADOMA-SHI, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS, PANASONIC CORPORATION, SONY CORPORATION, , JP

- Document: DE 60208708

- Effective date: 20130614

2013-08-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V., NL

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS, PANASONIC CORPORATION, SONY CORPORATION, , JP

- Document: DE 60208708

- Effective date: 20130614

2013-08-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V., NL

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V., EINDHOVEN, NL; PANASONIC CORPORATION, KADOMA-SHI, OSAKA, JP; SONY CORPORATION, TOKIO/TOKYO, JP

- Document: DE 60208708

- Effective date: 20130614

2013-08-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PANASONIC CORPORATION, KADOMA-SHI, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V., EINDHOVEN, NL; PANASONIC CORPORATION, KADOMA-SHI, OSAKA, JP; SONY CORPORATION, TOKIO/TOKYO, JP

- Document: DE 60208708

- Effective date: 20130614

2013-08-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SONY CORPORATION, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V., EINDHOVEN, NL; PANASONIC CORPORATION, KADOMA-SHI, OSAKA, JP; SONY CORPORATION, TOKIO/TOKYO, JP

- Document: DE 60208708

- Effective date: 20130614

2013-08-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60208708

- Representative's name: EISENFUEHR, SPEISER & PARTNER, DE

- Effective date: 20130614

2013-08-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60208708

- Representative's name: EISENFUEHR SPEISER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAEL, DE

- Effective date: 20130614

2013-06-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60208708

- Representative's name: EISENFUEHR, SPEISER & PARTNER, DE

2009-06-26 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060111

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061016

2008-07-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060111

2008-06-30 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060111

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060412

2007-09-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061012

2007-09-26 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HEEMSKERK, JACOBUS, PETRUS JOSEPHUS

2007-09-26 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHEP, CORNELIS, MARINUS

2007-09-26 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STEK, AALBERT

2007-09-26 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FURUMIYA, SHIGERU

2007-09-26 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ISHIBASHI, HIROMICHI

2007-09-26 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MINAMINO, JUNICHI

2007-09-26 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: OGAWA, HIROSHI,SONY CORPORATION

2007-09-26 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MASUHARA, SHIN,SONY CORPORATION

2007-09-26 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SANO, TATSUSHI,SONY CORPORATION

2006-12-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061012

2006-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-16 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061016

2006-08-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-06-12 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060612

2006-04-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060422

2006-04-11 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060411

2006-04-11 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060411

2006-04-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060411

2006-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60208708 P 20060406

2006-02-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2006-01-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-01-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2006-01-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060111

2006-01-11 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060111

2006-01-11 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060111

2006-01-11 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060111

2006-01-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060111

2006-01-11 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060111

2005-11-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HEEMSKERK, JACOBUS, PETRUS JOSEPHUS

2005-11-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHEP, CORNELIS, MARINUS

2005-11-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STEK, AALBERT

2005-11-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FURUMIYA, SHIGERU

2005-11-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ISHIBASHI, HIROMICHI

2005-11-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MINAMINO, JUNICHI

2005-11-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: OGAWA, HIROSHI,SONY CORPORATION

2005-11-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MASUHARA, SHIN,SONY CORPORATION

2005-11-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SANO, TATSUSHI,SONY CORPORATION

2004-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040920

2004-07-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040517

2004-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-07-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI