Global Patent Index - EP 1439592 A3

EP 1439592 A3 2007-10-24 - Methods and apparatus for assembling solid oxide fuel cells

Title (en)

Methods and apparatus for assembling solid oxide fuel cells

Title (de)

Methode und Vorrichtung zum Zusammenfügen einer Festoxid-Brennstoffzelle

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour assembler une pile à combustible à oxyde solide

Publication

EP 1439592 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 03257759 A

Priority

US 31575002 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US7329471B2] A solid oxide fuel cell comprises at least one hollow manifold, an anode, an electrolyte, and a cathode. The at least one hollow manifold comprises a wall that defines a chamber therein. A plurality of openings extending through, such that the plurality of openings are in flow communication with the chamber. The anode is formed on an exterior surface of the wall. The electrolyte is deposited on the anode, and the cathode is deposited on the electrolyte.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01M 8/02 (2006.01); H01M 8/04 (2006.01); H01M 8/12 (2006.01); H01M 8/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01M 8/2425 (2013.01); H01M 8/1231 (2016.02); H01M 8/1253 (2013.01); Y02E 60/525 (2013.01); Y02P 70/56 (2015.11); Y10T 29/49108 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV MK

EPO simple patent family

US 2004110054 A1 20040610; US 7329471 B2 20080212; AU 2003262352 A1 20040701; CA 2451060 A1 20040610; CN 1507096 A 20040623; EP 1439592 A2 20040721; EP 1439592 A3 20071024; JP 2004193125 A 20040708; JP 4764597 B2 20110907; KR 20040050872 A 20040617; SG 123585 A1 20060726

INPADOC legal status


2008-12-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080425

2008-08-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2008-07-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK

2007-10-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01M 8/02 20060101AFI20040525BHEP

2007-10-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01M 8/24 20060101ALI20070918BHEP

2007-10-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01M 8/04 20060101ALI20070918BHEP

2007-10-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01M 8/12 20060101ALI20070918BHEP

2004-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-07-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK