Global Patent Index - EP 1442891 B8

EP 1442891 B8 2010-02-17 - Inkjet printing apparatus

Title (en)

Inkjet printing apparatus

Title (de)

Tintenstrahldrucker

Title (fr)

Imprimante à jet d'encre

Publication

EP 1442891 B8 (EN)

Application

EP 04002095 A

Priority

JP 2003024968 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1442891A1] In an inkjet printing apparatus which includes a printhead (3) that discharges ink and an ink tank (9) detachably attached to the printhead, and executes printing by using the printhead that discharges the ink supplied from the ink tank, an ink tank detection section (A) detects the presence/absence of the ink tank. On the basis of the detection result, a control circuit (F) inhibits the cleaning operation of the printhead. <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/01 (2006.01); B41J 2/175 (2006.01); B41J 2/165 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/16517 (2013.01); B41J 2/17543 (2013.01); B41J 2/17546 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1442891 A1 20040804; EP 1442891 B1 20091111; EP 1442891 B8 20100217; DE 602004023980 D1 20091224; EP 2156955 A2 20100224; EP 2156955 A3 20100324; EP 2156955 B1 20111012; JP 2004230847 A 20040819; JP 4241067 B2 20090318; US 2004183853 A1 20040923; US 7185970 B2 20070306

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160802

2016-08-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 602004023980

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150131

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091111

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100211

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100201

2010-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100211

2010-10-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100930

2010-10-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100812

2010-01-06 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HAMASAKI, YUJI, C/O CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA

2009-12-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602004023980 P 20091224

2009-11-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2009-11-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2009-06-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA

2007-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070920

2005-08-24 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-04-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-04-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050204

2004-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-08-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK