Global Patent Index - EP 1443071 B8

EP 1443071 B8 2009-02-18 - Method of manufacturing a laminated foam article, foam article thus obtained and the use thereof

Title (en)

Method of manufacturing a laminated foam article, foam article thus obtained and the use thereof

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines geschäumten Verbundkörpers, der dadurch enthaltene Schaumkörper und seine Verwendung.

Title (fr)

Méthode pour la fabrication d'un article en mousse stratifié, article en mousse ainsi obtenu et son utilisation.

Publication

EP 1443071 B8 (EN)

Application

EP 04075149 A

Priority

NL 1022527 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1443071A1] The present invention relates to a method of manufacturing a laminated foam article, as well as to a laminated foam article obtained by using such a method. The present invention furthermore relates to the use of such a foam article. One aspect of the present invention is to provide a method of manufacturing a laminated foam article, which foam article is composed of at least two durably bonded-together layers, the outer layer of which can be provided in any desired colour.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08J 9/36 (2006.01); A47C 27/14 (2006.01); A47C 27/15 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 27/15 (2013.01); A47C 27/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1443071 A1 20040804; EP 1443071 B1 20081008; EP 1443071 B8 20090218; AT 10985 U1 20100215; AT 410470 T 20081015; DE 202004021552 U1 20081224; DE 602004016896 D1 20081120; DK 1443071 T3 20090216; ES 2315610 T3 20090401; NL 1022527 C2 20040803

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-15 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160123

2016-08-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 602004016896

2016-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20081008

2016-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20081008

2016-07-15 [REG AT MA03] REVOCATION OF THE PATENT

- Document: AT 410470 T

- Effective date: 20160211

2016-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160131

2016-05-11 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20160211

2016-05-11 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20160211

2016-04-15 [REG CH PLX] PATENT DECLARED INVALID FROM DATE OF GRANT ONWARDS

2015-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150121

- Year of fee payment: 12

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150122

- Year of fee payment: 12

2015-05-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150121

- Year of fee payment: 12

2015-05-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150122

- Year of fee payment: 12

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150121

- Year of fee payment: 12

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150121

- Year of fee payment: 12

2015-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150121

- Year of fee payment: 12

2015-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20150121

- Year of fee payment: 12

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150126

- Year of fee payment: 12

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150128

- Year of fee payment: 12

2015-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150129

- Year of fee payment: 12

2015-01-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-11-13 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: ETABLISSEMENTEN VRIJDAGHS

- Effective date: 20090708

2011-10-31 [REG DE R074] RE-ESTABLISHMENT ALLOWED

- Document: DE 602004016896

2011-10-31 [REG DE R409] INTERNAL RECTIFICATION OF THE LEGAL STATUS COMPLETED

- Document: DE 602004016896

2011-09-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081008

2011-09-14 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: BASF SE

- Effective date: 20090617

2011-09-14 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: POLYEX PAINT INDUSTRIAL B.V.

- Effective date: 20090707

2011-09-14 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: SIKA TECHNOLOGY AG

- Effective date: 20090708

2011-09-14 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: ETABLISSEMENTEN VRIJDAGHS

- Effective date: 20090708

2011-09-07 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: BASF SE

- Effective date: 20090617

2011-09-07 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: POLYEX PAINT INDUSTRIAL B.V.

- Effective date: 20090707

2011-09-07 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: SIKA TECHNOLOGY AG

- Effective date: 20090708

2011-09-07 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: ETABLISSEMENTEN VRIJDAGHS

- Effective date: 20090708

2011-08-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081008

2011-08-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 602004016896

2011-08-02 [REG DE R409] INTERNAL RECTIFICATION OF THE LEGAL STATUS COMPLETED

- Document: DE 602004016896

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-06-30 [PG25 HU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090409

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090123

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090123

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090109

2010-01-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090123

2009-12-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: BASF SE

2009-12-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: POLYEX PAINT INDUSTRIAL B.V.

2009-12-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SIKA TECHNOLOGY AG

2009-12-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: ETABLISSEMENTEN VRIJDAGHS

2009-10-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: BASF SE

2009-09-30 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BASF SE

- Effective date: 20090617

2009-09-30 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: POLYEX PAINT INDUSTRIAL B.V.

- Effective date: 20090707

2009-09-30 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SIKA TECHNOLOGY AG

- Effective date: 20090708

2009-09-30 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ETABLISSEMENTEN VRIJDAGHS

- Effective date: 20090708

2009-09-30 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081008

2009-08-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090131

2009-08-31 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081008

2009-08-05 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BASF SE

- Effective date: 20090617

2009-07-31 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081008

2009-07-31 [PG25 RO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081008

2009-05-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081008

2009-05-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090218

2009-04-30 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090108

2009-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2315610 T3

2009-02-27 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081008

2009-02-16 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2009-01-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SPIERENBURG & PARTNER AG, PATENT- UND MARKENANWAEL

2009-01-27 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2008-12-03 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SCHRAVEN HOLDING B.V.

2008-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602004016896 P 20081120

2008-11-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2008-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-10-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-03-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHRAVEN HOLDING B.V.

2008-02-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHRAVEN BEHEER BV

2007-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070516

2005-04-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-10-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040813

2004-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-08-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK