Global Patent Index - EP 1444760 B3

EP 1444760 B3 2009-02-25 - SPARK PLUG

Title (en)

SPARK PLUG

Title (de)

ZÜNDKERZE

Title (fr)

BOUGIE D'ALLUMAGE

Publication

EP 1444760 B3 (EN)

Application

EP 02777476 A

Priority

  • GB 0205000 W
  • GB 0127218 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO03043152A1] A spark plug (30; 40) comprises an electrically-insulating sleeve (12), a first electrode (16), an electrically-conducting shell (20) surrounding said sleeve, and a second electrode (22) mounted on said shell. The electrodes (16 and 22) define a spark gap (G1) of the plug. The shell (20) has an end portion (20c) terminating at an end surface (20b) of the shell. The sleeve (12) extends past said end portion (20c) with a clearance therebetween and extends beyond said end surface (20b). The sleeve (12) has at least one projection (32) which projects from the sleeve (12) and reduces said clearance in the region of the end surface (20b), thereby forming a secondary spark gap (G2).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01T 13/14 (2006.01); H01T 13/20 (2006.01); H01T 13/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01T 13/38 (2013.01); H01T 13/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 03043152 A1 20030522; DE 60222797 D1 20071115; DE 60222797 T2 20080703; DE 60222797 T3 20091001; EP 1444760 A1 20040811; EP 1444760 B1 20071003; EP 1444760 B3 20090225; GB 0127218 D0 20020102; GB 0225732 D0 20021211; GB 2382842 A 20030611; GB 2382842 B 20050615; GB 2382842 C 20081124; JP 2005510023 A 20050414; JP 4187654 B2 20081126; US 2005001526 A1 20050106; US 7057332 B2 20060606; US RE41672 E 20100914

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171130

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171018

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-10-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-10-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-10-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-06-16 [REG DE 8570] REINSTATEMENT OF THE FORMER POSITION

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090526

2011-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071130

2008-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080704

2008-07-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-06-11 [LIM1] LIMITATION IS ADMISSIBLE

- Free text: SEQUENCE NO: 1; FILED DURING OPPOSITION PERIOD

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080114

2008-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20071029

- Year of fee payment: 6

2007-11-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60222797 P 20071115

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2007-04-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2007-03-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070219

2004-08-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040428

2004-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-08-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI