Global Patent Index - EP 1444930 A3

EP 1444930 A3 2004-12-29 - Curtain rail comprising two supports and a rail

Title (en)

Curtain rail comprising two supports and a rail

Title (de)

Vorhangschiene aus zwei Halteelementen und einer Schiene

Title (fr)

Rail de rideau comprenant deux supports et un rail

Publication

EP 1444930 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 04002522 A

Priority

DE 20302011 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE102004004373A1] The curtain holders have a profile section (10) with each holder (50) having two wall sections (20,30). Along the length (11) of the profile sections are inserts (21) in the horizontal direction and which can not be moved and provide support in the vertical direction. The rear side (12) of the profile section has a reversed wall section. The holder is identical in its horizontal middle edge and can have swapping parts.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47H 1/102; A47H 1/142

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47H 1/102 (2006.01); A47H 1/142 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47H 1/102 (2013.01); A47H 1/142 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20302011 U1 20030417; DE 102004004373 A1 20040819; EP 1444930 A2 20040811; EP 1444930 A3 20041229

INPADOC legal status


2008-03-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070908

2005-09-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-08-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050618

2004-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK

2004-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 47H 1/102 A

2004-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 47H 1/142 B

2004-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-08-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK